ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch v. Doshi
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-09128

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2019 at 3:01 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Icici Bank Limited, New York Branch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rohit Sabharwal +1 212 686 1000 sabilaw@aol.com
v.
No Logo Alpesh Panchal, Defendant
No Logo Apoorva Doshi, Defendant
No Logo Atit Shah, Defendant
No Logo Gurudas Patwardhan, Defendant
No Logo Hiren Shah, Defendant
No Logo Nihar Parikh, Defendant
No Logo Sanjay Shah, Defendant
No Logo Shiraj Deshpande, Defendant
No Logo Shrikrishna Sant, Defendant
No Logo Vishal Doshi, Defendant
No Logo Wanlu Zeng, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rivkin Radler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY NANCY ANN DEL PIZZO +1 201 287 2460 +1 201 489 0495 nancy.delpizzo@rivkin.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 16 Letter, filed by Apoorva Doshi. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Defendant. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Apoorva Doshi answer due 12/1/2018.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/7/2018) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from A. Doshi, dated 11/1/18 re: Defendant A. Doshi requests that the Court grant an extension of thirty days, from 11/2/18 up to and including 12/1/18, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in order to review and respond to the claims and to engage legal counsel. Document filed by Apoorva Doshi.(sc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 14 Letter filed by Wanlu Zeng. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. Wanlu Zeng answer due 11/28/2018. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/30/2018) (mro)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nancy A. Del Pizzo dated October 26, 2018 re: Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Wanlu Zeng.(Del Pizzo, Nancy)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Ann Del Pizzo on behalf of Wanlu Zeng. (Del Pizzo, Nancy)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ICICI Bank Limited, Other Affiliate ICICI Prudential Life Insurance Company Limited, Other Affiliate ICICI Securities Limited, Other Affiliate ICICI Lombard General Life Insurance Company Limited for ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch.(Sabharwal, Rohit) (Entered: 10/21/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Wanlu Zeng served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service was accepted by Wanlu Zeng. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apoorva Doshi. (sj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wanlu Zeng. (sj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apoorva Doshi, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wanlu Zeng, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: 5 Complaint. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Sabharwal, Rohit) Modified on 10/5/2018 (sj).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Shiraj Deshpande, Apoorva Doshi, Vishal Doshi, Alpesh Panchal, Nihar Parekh, Gurudas Patwardhan, Shrikrishna Sant, Atit Shah, Hiren Shah, Sanjay Shah, Wanlu Zeng. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Preliminary Forensic Report, # 2 Exhibit B, Part 1, Borrowing Base Analysis, # 3 Exhibit B, Part 2, Group Co. Numbers)(Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wanlu Zeng, re: 1 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Apoorva Doshi, re: 1 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Sabharwal, Rohit)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AMENDED COMPLAINT against ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch.Document filed by ICICI Bank Limited, New York Branch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Preliminary Forensic Report, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 1, Borrowing Base Analysis, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 2, Group Co. Numbers)(Sabharwal, Rohit) Modified on 10/5/2018 (sj).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for 5 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-15661801, paid on 10/04/2018. (pne)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rohit Sabharwal. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nihar Parikh. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rohit Sabharwal. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 370 (Other Fraud); Dollar Demand 36,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 470 (Racketeer/Corrupt Organization); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?