Day, et al v. Provident Bank, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-00674-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Clyde Day, Plaintiff
No Logo Janet Day, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by azrael.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miriam Lapp Azrael +1 410 252 2231 +1 410 252 8502 mail@azrael.com
v.
No Logo Homeview Contractors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene J Silverman +1 410 685 1360 +1 410 727 7470

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Richard Marc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Levin +1 410 385 4285 +1 410 539 7611 rbl@shapirosher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by sbhpa.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Bloch +1 410 332 0100 +1 410 332 0885 richard@sbhpa.com
No Logo Provident Bank Of Maryland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill G. Miller +1 410 332 8600
Space Carla Stone Witzel +1 410 332 8600

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ava E Lias Booker +1 410 659 4500 +1 410 659 4558 alias-booker@mcguirewoods.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/17/1994
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 371 - Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601 Truth in Lending
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 11/30/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/2/1994 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 11/30/94, Ordered that this action is hereby DISMISSED with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed, the entry of this Order is without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 60 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (microfilmed 11/30/94) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/2/1994 Terminated Case
    Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 12/5/1994 Status Conference
      Status conference held before Nickerson, J., in chambers. (mjl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: 11/2/1994 Scheduling Conference
        Scheduling conference held before Nickerson, J. in chambers. (mjl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 10/25/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994, Terminated: 11/30/1994 Motion to Amend/Correct
          JOINT MOTION by Clyde Day, Janet Day, Homeview Contractors, Provident Bank to Amend [10-1] Scheduling order (slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: 10/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER dated 10/12/94 granting [11-1] joint motion to Amend [10-1] Scheduling order to extend motions deadline, and that the parties shall have until 10/26/94 to file motions for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/12/1994, Terminated: 10/12/1994 Motion to Amend/Correct
              JOINT MOTION by Clyde Day, Janet Day, Homeview Contractors, Provident Bank to Amend [10-1] Scheduling order to extend motions deadline (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 5/11/1994, Entered: 5/11/1994 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER dated 5/11/94, discovery due 9/12/94, and motions due 7/13/94. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Provident Bank (Attorney Ava E. Lias-Booker), (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: 4/15/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER dated 4/14/94 granting [7-1] joint motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint, reset Answer deadline to 5/9/94 for Provident Bank ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: 4/15/1994, Terminated: 4/15/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      JOINT MOTION by Clyde Day, Janet Day, Provident Bank to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Homeview Contractors (Attorney Richard Bloch, Robert B. Levin), (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/11/1994, Entered: 4/11/1994 Summons Returned Executed
                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Homeview Contractors 3/30/94 Answer due on 4/19/94 for Homeview Contractors (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994 Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Provident Bank of, Homeview Contractors (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994 Correspondence
                              CORRESPONDENCE from plaintiff requesting summons. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994 Remark
                                Request of plaintiff to withhold issuance of process. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994 Jury Demand
                                  DEMAND for jury trial by Clyde Day, Janet Day. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 019349. (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?