Tekle v. Al Saud
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00211
District Judge Thomas Selby Ellis, III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 5, 2018 at 1:57 AM DT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Simret Semere Tekle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 520

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Cooper Marritz +1 703 778 3450 +1 703 778 3454 nicholas@justice4all.org
v.
No Logo Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY John L Brownlee +1 703 720 8600 +1 703 720 8610 john.brownlee@hklaw.com
No Logo Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY John L Brownlee +1 703 720 8600 +1 703 720 8610 john.brownlee@hklaw.com
Citation 18 USC 1595 Human Trafficking Litigation
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration. It is further ORDERED that defendants may file a sur-surreply in response to plaintiff's sur-reply by the close of business on September 6, 2018, if defendants so desire. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 09/06/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Memorandum in Support re 48 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Brownlee, John) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
      LREF
      Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
        LREF
        Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER that pltf's 44 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defts' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and that Pltf's Proposed Sur-Reply to Deft's Motion to Dismiss is hereby DEEMED filed. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 09/05/18. (pmil, ) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
          LREF
          Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Waiver of re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re 31 Motion to Dismiss [Waiver of Hearing] by Simret Semere Tekle (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
            LREF
            Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Memorandum in Support re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re 31 Motion to Dismiss [Proposed Surreply and Exhibits] filed by Simret Semere Tekle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
              LREF
              Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re 31 Motion to Dismiss by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Complaint filed by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR (Main Document 42 replaced on 7/27/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 7/27/2018 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Complaint filed by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Memorandum in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, September 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. re 36 Notice of Hearing Date, 35 Memorandum in Support, 34 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Complaint (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, September 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 32 Memorandum in Support, 33 Notice of Hearing Date (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice of Hearing Date Friday, July 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. re 35 Memorandum in Support, 34 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Complaint (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Memorandum in Support re 34 MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Complaint filed by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Strike 28 Amended Complaint by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, July 27, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 32 Memorandum in Support (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Memorandum in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. As required by federal rule, defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from the date the amended complaint was filed to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/25/2018. (dvanm, ) Modified to correct docket text on 6/28/2018 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Simret Semere Tekle.(Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, July 13, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. re 24 Memorandum in Support, 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 22 Motion for Pro hac vice David Lee Haller. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/11/18. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 21 Motion for Pro hac vice by Stuart Gordon Nash. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/11/18. (gwalk, ) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Lee Haller and Certification of Local Counsel John L. Brownlee Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6124443. by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart Gordon Nash and Certification of Local Counsel John L. Brownlee Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6124440. by Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Leslie Brownlee on behalf of Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud (Brownlee, John) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/01/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/01/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Linnell Bessell and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Cooper Marritz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6109554. by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Martina Elizabeth Vandenberg and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Cooper Marritz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6109535. by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE by Simret Semere Tekle re 13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Notice re Service of Process (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER - Plaintiff is hereby warned that failure to serve defendants and to file a valid proof of service with the Court on or before June 4, 2018 at 5:00 p.m., will result in the dismissal of plaintiffs claims without prejudice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 05/30/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means. plaintiff has leave to serve by: (I) posting a copy of the summons, complaint, and this order on the main entrance of defendants' home in Virginia; (2) mailing a copy of the summons, complaint, and this order to defendants address in Virginia: and (3) sending a copy of the summons, complaint, and this order by FedEx to defendants' address in Jeddah, Saudi Arabia. Following service through these three means, plaintiff shall file a notice of service with the Clerk's Office affirming compliance with this order indicating the dates on which service was enacted through each method. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/16/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Waiver of re 11 MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means WAIVER OF HEARING by Simret Semere Tekle (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION Leave to Serve Process by Alternative Means by Simret Semere Tekle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 02/26/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 02/26/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 02/26/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 02/26/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leake Fesseha and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Marritz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5964618. by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Agnieszka M. Fryszman and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Marritz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5963638. by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan A. Langlinais and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Marritz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5963619. by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard F. Levy and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas Marritz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5963588. by Simret Semere Tekle. (Marritz, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Mohammad bin Abdullah Al Saud, Nouf bin Nayef Abul- Al Saud ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5963104.), filed by Simret Semere Tekle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/26/2018) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/26/2018) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?