Aminian v. Social Security Administration
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01395-HZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 4:10 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Rent, Lease, Ejectment
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
    Opinion and Order: The Amended Complaint 10 is dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. Plaintiff's renewed motion for appointment of counsel 11 is denied. Signed on 9/27/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (jp)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
        Opinion and Order. I grant Plaintiff's amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis 6 . Because Plaintiff fails to state a claim, I dismiss the Complaint 1 . Although I have serious doubts that Plaintiff can articulate a claim supporting federa l court jurisdiction, I give Plaintiff leave to amend. Any amended complaint is due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Opinion. Failure to file an amended pleading by that time will result in dismissal of this action. The Clerks Office is directed to withhold issuance of any summons until further order of the Court. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 3 is denied. Given Plaintiff's claims, there is little likelihood of success on the merits and appointment of counsel is not warranted.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 9/14/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 4 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?