Yuridia Trujillo v. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 17-3480

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2018 at 6:04 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703177552 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/09/2018 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6909467-2] [6909467] [17-3480] (VG)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER re: Plaintiff-appellant Yuridia Trujillo's agreed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [12][13][6909450] [17-3480] (VG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint motion filed by Appellant Yuridia Trujillo to dismiss case. [12] [6909409] [17-3480] (Edelman, Daniel)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, counsel for the Appellant and Appellee is directed to make a telephonic status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 03/08/2018. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. RJS [6907005] [17-3480] (ER)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, counsel for the Appellant and Appellee is directed to make a telephonic status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 02/21/2018. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. RJS [6903080] [17-3480] (CAG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic or electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 01/30/2018. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. RJS [6895232] [17-3480] (CAG)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/09/2018 for Yuridia Trujillo. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/09/2018 for Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/23/2018 for Appellant Yuridia Trujillo. RJS [6892115] [17-3480] (VG)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, January 9, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [7] [6892112] [17-3480] (VG)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance form filed by Attorney Dara Chevlin Tarkowski for Appellee Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC. [6] [6890430] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [17-3480]--[Edited 12/15/2017 by AD to reflect proper document filed.] (Tarkowski, Dara)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Yuridia Trujillo. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [6889031] [17-3480] (Edelman, Daniel)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 10 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?