Town of Sturbridge v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-40126
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 9:41 PM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Town of Sturbridge, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodman Rodman & Sandman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Sandman +1 781 322 3720 +1 781 324 6906 rsandman@rrslaw.net
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS Health Corporation, Individually,, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
No Logo Rite Aid Corporation, Individually,, Defendant
No Logo Rite Aid of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Individually, Defendant
No Logo Walmart Stores East, LP, Individually, Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Individually,, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Individually,, Rite Aid of Massachusetts, Inc., SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Individually, Walmart Stores East, LP, Individually, Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against Town of Sturbridge Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7248208 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Sturbridge. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Category Form)(Sandman, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 21 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?