United States v. Kukstis
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-10241

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 14, 2021 at 1:42 PM DT (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SETH B. KOSTO +1 973 645 2700 seth.kosto@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph T. Kukstis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Frederick J. Barry, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Barry +1 508 888 3774

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Barsky +1 617 223 8061 amy_barsky@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Services/Probation Request
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Memorandum - not related to a motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Objection - unrelated to a motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Services/Probation Request
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None plea agreement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph T. Kukstis Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information hearing set for 8/23/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Counsel is to contact U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services as soon as possible http://www.map.uscourts.gov/psi-interview-schedule to determine scheduling of the presentence interview. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Joseph T. Kukstis; Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None information - felony
                            INFORMATION (Felony) as to Joseph T. Kukstis (1) count(s) 1-3. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                              Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION as to Joseph T. Kukstis. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Further Detention Hearing as to Joseph T. Kukstis held on 4/30/2018. Case called, Counsel, PO Canino & Defendant appear, Counsel argue, Matter taken under advisement, Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. (Attorneys present: Kosto, McNamara, Barksy. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording 10:30. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                  Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered as to Joseph T. Kukstis re 20 Notice of Hearing. "Among the matters that the parties should be prepared to address at the detention hearing on Monday, April 30, 2018, is the effect of the recent Supreme Court decision in Sessions v. Dimaya, No. 15-1498, 2018 U.S. LEXIS 2497 (April 17, 2018) on section 3156(a)(4)(B) of Title 18." (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Barsky appearing for Joseph T. Kukstis. Type of Appearance: Federal Defender Office. (Barsky, Amy) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Amended Document - NOT Motion
                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT Amendment to 19 Response (unrelated to a motion) Supplement to April 18, 2018 Memorandum Regarding Supreme Court's Decision in Sessions v. Dimaya as to Joseph T. Kukstis: (McNamara, Cara) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph T. Kukstis; Further Detention Hearing set for 4/30/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Response Unrelated to a Motion
                                          Response as to Joseph T. Kukstis: 17 Order,,. (McNamara, Cara) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Memorandum (not related to a motion)
                                            Memorandum regarding 18 USC 3156(a)(4) as to Joseph T. Kukstis (Kosto, Seth) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                              Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered as to Joseph T. Kukstis. The parties are directed to submit by April 18, 2018, briefing of no more than seven pages on the following two issues:1. The standard of proof by which the government must establish that a person poses a risk of obstruction of justice or witnesses tampering as set forth in 18 USC s 3142(f)(2)(B); and 2. Whether the offense of stalking, 18 USC s 2252A(2) is a crime of violence within the meaning of 18 USC s 3156(a)(4). (Alba, Robert) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Exhibit/Witness List
                                                EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST re: Detention Hearing as to Joseph T. Kukstis (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Preliminary Hearing
                                                  WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Joseph T. Kukstis (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Preliminary HearingCourt Filing
                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Joseph T. Kukstis held on 4/6/2018. Case called, Counsel, PO Miller & Defendant appear, Defendant waives preliminary hearing and files waiver, Government calls Michael Bodini, Cross, Re-direct, Counsel argue, Matter taken under advisement, Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. (Attorneys present: Kosto, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording 2:00. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frederick Barry appearing for Joseph T. Kukstis. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Jones, Sherry) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.Court Filing
                                                        Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER PROGRAM as to Joseph T. Kukstis (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Initial Appearance as to Joseph T. Kukstis held on 4/3/2018 in courtroom 15, USDC, Boston, MA; deft advised of charges; deft advised of Constitutional and legal rights; deft advised of right to detention and preliminary hearings; deft's filed financial affidavit reviewed and approved for appointment of counsel; Court appointed the Federal Public Defender Office (Cara McNamara) to represent the deft; Gov't stated the maximum penalties; Gov't requested for detention and a continuance; Court granted said request; Detention/Preliminary Hearings set for 4/6/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy; deft remanded to custody of USM. (Attorneys present: AUSA Kosto for the Gov't; McNamara for the deft. ) (USPO: A. Cormier)Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Lovett, Jarrett) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph T. Kukstis; Initial Appearance set for 4/3/2018 12:45 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion to Unseal in part Case as to Joseph T. Kukstis (1) (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                MOTION to Unseal Case as to Joseph T. Kukstis by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                  Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy as to Joseph T. Kukstis. (Jones, Sherry) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT as to Joseph T. Kukstis (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Michael W. Fahey, # 2 JS45)(Jones, Sherry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2018: # 3 Affidavit of Michael W. Fahey (Redacted)) (Belpedio, Lisa). [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                      Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Joseph T. Kukstis (1). (Jones, Sherry) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal Case
                                                                        MOTION to Seal Case as to Joseph T. Kukstis by USA. (Jones, Sherry) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Joseph T. Kukstis; Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) [4:18-mj-04174-DHH] (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?