Sayin v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00643-LY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 1:24 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Betul Ayse Sayin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Catholic Charities of Central Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Krebs Muller +1 512 651 6124 joseph-muller@ccctx.org
No Logo Fatih Mehmet Sayin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Catholic Charities of Central Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Krebs Muller +1 512 651 6124 joseph-muller@ccctx.org
v.
No Logo Daniel Renaud, Defendant
No Logo Gary Garman, Defendant
Nielsen, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kirstjen, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirstjen M. Nielsen"
No Logo Lee Francis Cissna, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Pompeo"
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Paniszczyn +1 210 384 7325 +1 210 384 7312 john.paniszczyn@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None supplement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Sealed document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Attachment
                                  ATTACHMENT (Proposed Order) to 10 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and or Temporary Restraining Order by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Deficiency Notice
                                    DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 10 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and or Temporary Restraining Order (dl) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
                                      MOTION for Permanent Injunction and or Temporary Restraining Order by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. Lee Francis Cissna served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; Gary Garman served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; Daniel Renaud served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; United States of America served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. Lee Francis Cissna served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; Gary Garman served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; Daniel Renaud served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; United States of America served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. Lee Francis Cissna served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; Gary Garman served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; Daniel Renaud served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; United States of America served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betul Ayse Sayin; Fatih Mehmet Sayin. Lee Francis Cissna served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; Gary Garman served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; Daniel Renaud served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; United States of America served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. US Department of State (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dl) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin. (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                    Summons Issued as to Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Michael Pompeo, United States of America (cj) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Betul Ayse Sayin, Fatih Mehmet Sayin., (Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11068053), filed by Fatih Mehmet Sayin, Betul Ayse Sayin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Muller, Joseph) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?