Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:16-cv-00233
District Judge Roger W Titus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 12:11 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Appeal Remark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Appeal Remark
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None USCA Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Supplemental
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None USCA Case Number
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Amended Notice of Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of appeal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Memorandum/Opinion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None QC Notice - Miscellaneous
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None Response to motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Standing Order Concerning Removal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Local Rule
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice - other
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?