Promuto v. Casey
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-08770
District Judge Lawrence M. McKenna, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 3:24 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Louis V. Promuto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eisenberg Tanchum & Levy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stewart L. Levy +1 212 599 0777 +1 212 599 0770 slevy@etllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyman & Ash

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY CLETUS P. LYMAN +1 215 732 7040 cletus@lymanash.com
v.
No Logo Business Integrity Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
No Logo City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Jose Maldonado, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Trade Waste Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond V. Casey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: plaintiff voluntarily dismisses this action with prejudice as against defendants. The City of New York shall pay to plaintiff the sum of $140,000.00, inclusive of costs, attorneys' fees and disbursements. Payments shall be made by forwarding to plaintiff's attorney a check in the settlement amount payable to plaintiffs attorneys, Lyuman & Ash as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 7/26/04) (db, ) (Entered: 07/28/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 6/23/2004) (jp, ) (Entered: 06/25/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lawrence M. McKenna from Sherrill Kurland dated 3/31/04 re: granting counsel for parties joint request for the court to extend the time for completion of discovery in this action by sixty days until 5/31/04 and extend the date for filing dispositive motion and a joint pretrial order by sixty days. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 4/1/04) (dle, ) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Scheduling Order. All of the dates in this order are extended by 3 months. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 1/7/04) (sac, ) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by 12/31/03. Any party wishing to make a dispositive motion must serve and file, by 1/7/04; If (and only if) no dispositive motion has been made, the joint pre-tiral order, in a format that complies with the trial Judge's individual rules, must be filed by 2/27/04. Plaintiff must serve his sections of the pre-trial order by 1/30/04. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna ) (jco) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Memorandum to Docket Clerk: ptc held (cd) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order: that all discovery cutoff 10/31/03; plaintiff may serve and file amended complaint not later than 9/30/03. Reference to Magistrate Judge Eaton remains in effect. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna ); (pl) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Notice of Case reassignment to Judge Lawrence M. McKenna . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Sherrill Kurland, Cletus P. Lyman, Stewart L. Levy . (laq) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION and ORDER, the Business Integrity Commission is added as a party defendant as successor to the Trade Waste Commission. Trade Waste Commission as used in this action, including in pleadings, orders and judgments, shall include the Business Integrity Commission as successor to the Trade Waste Commission . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton ) Copies mailed by chambers. (kw) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Memo endorsed on copy of motion; granting [11-1] motion for Louis V. Promuto to appear pro hac vice for plntf. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton ); (Sent to the Attorney Admissions Clerk). (kw) (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Louis V. Promuto for Louis V. Promuto to appear pro hac vice for plntf ; Return Date 6/19/03 at 10:00. (cd) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Louis V. Promuto for an order, admitting Cletus P. Lyman to appear pro hac vice as counsel of record for pltff ; Return Date 3/3/03 at 10:00 a.m. Affidavit of Stewart L. Levy in support attached. (sac) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Any motion for leave to amend the pleadings or to add parties must be served and filed by 3/4/03; All expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by 8/29/03; Any party wishing to make a dispositive motion must serve and file, by 9/8/03, a letter to Judge Martin, not exceed three pages, requesting a pre-motion conference and setting forth the basis for the anticipated motion; If (and only if) no dispositve motion has been made, the joint pre-trial order, in a format that complies with the trial Judge's individual rules, must be filed by 10/24/03. Plaintiff must serve his sections of the pre-trial order by 9/30/03. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton ); (jco) (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Initial pretrial conference held before Mag. Judge Eaton on 2/11/03. To amend pleadings or add parties by 3/4/03; fact discovery by 8/29/03; all expert discovery by 8/29/03; any dispositive motion letter to Judge Martin by 9/8/03. 3 pgs. only and joint pretrial order by 9/30/03. (sac) (Entered: 02/14/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER to Complaint by Raymond V. Casey, Jose Maldonado, City of New York, NYC Trade Waste (Attorney Sherrill Kurland from the firm Michael A. Cardozo, Corp. Counsel of the City of New York). (ae) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                STIPULATION and ORDER; answer due to complaint for 1/15/03 for NYC Trade Waste, for City of New York, for Jose Maldonado, for Raymond V. Casey . ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (jco) Modified on 01/08/2003 (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, that Judge John S. Martin has referred this case to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton for general pretrial supervision. He will make decisions about the discovery phase of the litigation but not about motions to dismiss; counsel for parties must call Courtroom deputy Helen Lewis at (212) 805-6183 to schedule a case management conference . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton ); Copies mailed by chambers. (dle) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial/Including Initial Case Management Conference. Referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (tp) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of S/C executed as to NYC Trade Waste by Ivette Escobar on 11/21/02 . Answer due on 12/11/02 for NYC Trade Waste . (cd) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Louis V. Promuto . (gf) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 455055. (gf) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?