BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00401-RC-BMK-ESH

Tags
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 7:18 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad Wilson Dunn +1 281 580 6310 +1 281 580 6310 chad@brazilanddunn.com
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 703 567 5873 +5675 567 567 5876 ghebert@campaignlegalcenter.org
v.
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy F. Mellett +1 202 307 6262 +1 202 307 3961
No Logo Thomas E Perez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy F. Mellett +1 202 307 6262 +1 202 307 3961
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy F. Mellett +1 202 307 6262 +1 202 307 3961

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
No Logo DONNA JEAN FORGAS, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo DONNA JEAN FORGAS, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
No Logo MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Getz +1 409 832 3381 +1 409 832 3384 mdgetz@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN ANDREW SHEEHAN +1 202 572 8665 +1 202 572 8687 jsheehan@clarkhill.com
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Cross Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy F. Mellett +1 202 307 6262 +1 202 307 3961
No Logo Thomas E Perez, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy F. Mellett +1 202 307 6262 +1 202 307 3961
United States of America United States of America, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel J. Freeman +1 202 305 4355 daniel.freeman@usdoj.gov
Space JENIGH J GARRETT +1 202 305 4777 +1 202 307 3961 jenigh.garrett@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy F. Mellett +1 202 307 6262 +1 202 307 3961
No Logo GARY CANTUE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
No Logo MACARTHUR ENGLISH, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
No Logo OVEAL WALKER, III, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
No Logo RONALD BISHOP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/27/2013
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 8/21/2013
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags 3JUD-PANEL,CLOSED,TYPE-N
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: 5/20/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on 4/23/13; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance:5/20/14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Court Reporter Email Address : patfromhawaii@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2014.(Kaneshiro-Miller, Patricia)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [58] Motion for Order and [69] Motion to Intervene, granting [66] Motion to Dismiss, and denying all other pending motions as moot. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras. (lcrc2)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
      MINUTE ORDER granting [70] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Neil G. Baron is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 20, 2013. (lcrc2)
        LREF
        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
        MINUTE ORDER granting [34] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles R. Spies is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 20, 2013. (lcrc2)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Notice - other
          NOTICE Advisory Concerning State Court Action by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Dunn, Chad)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
            REPLY to opposition to motion re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Sheehan, John)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Notice - other
              NOTICE Advisory of State Court Actions by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Hebert, Joseph)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Notice - other
                NOTICE Advisory to the Court Concerning Rodriguez Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss by RONALD BISHOP, GARY CANTUE, MACARTHUR ENGLISH, OVEAL WALKER, III re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Spiva, Bruce)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Response to motion
                  RESPONSE re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Garrett, Jenigh)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Memorandum in opposition
                    Memorandum in opposition to re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Dunn, Chad)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Notice - other
                      NOTICE Advisory Concerning Board Action by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dunn, Chad) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/31/2013) (znmw, ).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Notice - other
                        NOTICE Advisory Concerning State Court Briefing by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Dunn, Chad)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Notice - other
                          NOTICE INTERVENORS ADVISORY TO THE COURT CONCERNING DISMISSAL OF SECTION 5 COURT ACTION IN RELATED MATTER PENDING IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Response to motion
                            RESPONSE re [69] MOTION to Intervene filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Freeman, Daniel)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Notice - other
                              NOTICE Advisory to Court Concerning State Court Proceeding by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dunn, Chad)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Notice - other
                                NOTICE Advisory to the Court Concerning State Court Proceeding by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dunn, Chad)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013 Notice of appearance
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce V. Spiva on behalf of OVEAL WALKER, III (Spiva, Bruce)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neil G. Baron, :Firm- Law Office of Neil G. Baron, :Address- 914 FM 517 Rd W, STE 242, Dickinson, Texas. Phone No. - (281) 534-2748. Fax No. - (281) 534-4309 by OVEAL WALKER, III (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Spiva, Bruce)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion to intervene
                                      MOTION to Intervene by OVEAL WALKER, III, GARY CANTUE, MACARTHUR ENGLISH, RONALD BISHOP (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Spiva, Bruce)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Notice of QC
                                        NOTICE OF ERROR re [67] Memorandum; emailed to jsheehan@clarkhill.com, cc'd 17 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, memorandum should be attached to the motion entry, not filed separately. DO NOT REFILE. (znmw, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion To Stay
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay Time to File an Answer to Intervenors' Cross-Claim by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Garrett, Jenigh)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 MEMORANDUM
                                            MEMORANDUM re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, DONNA JEAN FORGAS by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Sheehan, John)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ (Sheehan, John)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [58] Joint MOTION for Order Regarding November 2013 Election filed by ERIC HOLDER, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [58] Joint MOTION for Order Regarding November 2013 Election filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Dunn, Chad)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [63] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Any replies to the intervenors' opposition to [58] the joint motion by plaintiff and defendants for an order regarding a November 2013 election shall be filed no later than July 10, 2013. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 3, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013, Terminated: 7/3/2013 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Intervenors' Opposition (Doc. No. 62) to Joint Motion for Order of Election (Doc. No. 58) by ERIC HOLDER, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Garrett, Jenigh)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Response to motion
                                                        RESPONSE re [58] Joint MOTION for Order Regarding November 2013 Election INTERVENORS' OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION filed by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Sheehan, John)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Notice - other
                                                          NOTICE Concerning Shelby County by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT.(znmw, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [47] Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; granting [50] Motion to Suspend Discovery; and setting briefing deadline for Intervenors' opposition (if any) to [58] Joint Motion for Order Regarding the November 2013 Election. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/21/2013.(lcrc3)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion for order
                                                                Joint MOTION for Order Regarding November 2013 Election by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Garrett, Jenigh)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Notice - other
                                                                  NOTICE ADVISORY TO THE COURT CONCERNING REMOVED SUIT by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Remand Order)(Hebert, Joseph)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Notice - other
                                                                    NOTICE of Section 5 Determination by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Garrett, Jenigh)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [47] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Reply to Intervenors' Opposition)(Hebert, Joseph)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The Beaumont Independent School District may reply to the intervenors' opposition to [48] the pending motion for leave to file a second amended complaint on or before June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 12, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Response to motion
                                                                          RESPONSE re [53] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Intervenors' Opposition (Doc. No. 48) to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 47) Invtervenor's Opposition to Extend Time to File Reply filed by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013, Terminated: 6/12/2013 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Intervenors' Opposition (Doc. No. 48) to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 47) by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hebert, Joseph)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Notice - other
                                                                              NOTICE Concerning Expert Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                ANSWER to [35] Amended Complaint by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related document: [35] Amended Complaint filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT.(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Motion to Continue
                                                                                  MOTION to Suspend Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry [49] to view document). (znmw, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                    NOTICE and Motion to Suspend Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE re [47] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint INTERVENORS' OPPOSITION filed by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-4 BISD final opp motion to amend)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013, Terminated: 6/21/2013 motion for leave to file
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Leave)(Dunn, Chad)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                          Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/19/2013; Motions in Limine due by 6/24/2013; Finding of Facts due by 6/26/2013; Responses due by 6/26/2013. (tj)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                            Intervenors' ANSWER to [35] Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, DONNA JEAN FORGAS. Related document: [35] Amended Complaint filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT.(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 17, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                NOTICE Advisory to the Court Concerning Removed Suit by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Dunn, Chad)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 10, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [33] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael D. Getz is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 7, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Response to Document
                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [38] Trial Brief, filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [37] Scheduling Order filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Dunn, Chad)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Garrett, Jenigh)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                            NOTICE Advisory to the Court Concerning Board Action by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Declaration Declaration of Melody G. Chappell)(Dunn, Chad)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Trial Brief
                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM INTERVENORS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN ACCORDANCE WITH COURT ORDER by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John) Modified event title on 5/1/2013 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 24, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [8] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 23, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles R. Spies, :Firm- Clark Hill PLC, :Address- 601 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, North Building Suite 1000, Washington, DC 20004. Phone No. - 202-572-8663. Fax No. - 202-572-8683 by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013, Terminated: 5/7/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael D. Getz, :Address- PO Box 1083, Beaumont, TX 77704. Phone No. - 409-832-3381. Fax No. - 409-832-3384 by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2013. [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THOMAS PEREZ, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Granted for reasons stated on the record - order to follow). Motion by intervenors due by 4/30/13; Plaintiff and Government response due by 5/6/13 5pm. Parties to meet and confer on map issue by 5/3/13. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry [32] Notice (Other) was entered in error and has been refiled as Docket Entry [35] Amended Complaint. (znmw, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of QC
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ERROR re [31] Notice (Other); emailed to chad@brazilanddunn.com, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Entered in error; Exhibit must be accompanied by an Errata or a Notice of Filing (znmw, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(znmw, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Dunn, Chad) Modified on 4/23/2013 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Corrected Exhibit 13 by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT re [28] Supplemental Memorandum, (Dunn, Chad) Modified on 4/23/2013 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , and [25] Reply to Intervenors' Memorandum filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Hebert, Joseph) Modified to add link on 4/23/2013 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Exhibit List for Plaintiffs Brief in Support of United States Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14)(Dunn, Chad) Modified event title on 4/23/2013 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE CORRECTIONS TO INTERVENORS OPPOSITION TO UNITED STATES MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ re [25] Response to motion,, (Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Exhibit List by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction INTERVENORS OPPOSITION TO UNITED STATES filed by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Exhibit, # (13) Exhibit, # (14) Exhibit, # (15) Exhibit, # (16) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [14] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 19, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re [14] MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Expedite filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Hebert, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [14] MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Expedite filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, and District Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 18, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Transcript of Hearing by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ re [19] Response to motion, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re [17] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the All Writs Act Opposition to Attorney General's Motion for Injunction filed by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sheehan, John)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw [17] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the All Writs Act by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2013. Movants Intervention Motions (w/ declarations of evidence attached) due by 4/19/2013 5pm ; Replies due by 4/22/2013 5pm; Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2013 @ 4:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Order to follow) (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. The court will hold a teleconference with the parties and the proposed intervenors at 2:15 p.m. today, April 18, to set the schedule for briefing and the date for a hearing on [8] the United States' motion for a preliminary injunction. The court will provide a phone number and an access code for the teleconference. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 18, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the All Writs Act by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 Designation of Judges to serve on Three Judge PanelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    USCA ORDER filed in USCA on April 15, 2013 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT: designating Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh and District Judge Ellen S. Huvelle to hear and determine this case with District Judge Rudolph Contreras. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (ds)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for expedited hearing before District Court of Three Judges by DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL, MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sheehan, John) Modified text on 4/16/2013 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: 4/10/2013, Terminated: 4/19/2013 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene by MARCELINO RODRIGUEZ, DONNA JEAN FORGAS, LINDA MARIE WILTZ GILMORE, MICHAEL SCOTT NEIL (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(rdj). Added MOTION to Expedite on 4/10/2013 (rdj).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [8] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 9, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT re [6] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment seeking interim relief (Hebert, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Order on Motion to Convene a Three-Judge CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [2] Motion to Convene Three-Judge Court. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 9, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jenigh J. Garrett on behalf of All Defendants (Garrett, Jenigh)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [6] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment seeking interim relief filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013, Terminated: 4/9/2013 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order : TRO, # (3) Text of Proposed Order : PI, # (4) Exhibit 1, # (5) Exhibit 2, # (6) Exhibit 3, # (7) Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit 5, # (9) Exhibit 6, # (10) Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit 8, # (12) Exhibit 9, # (13) Exhibit 10, # (14) Exhibit 11, # (15) Exhibit 12, # (16) Exhibit 13, # (17) Exhibit 14, # (18) Exhibit 15, # (19) Exhibit 16)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2013 re [8] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Oral argument heard and motion is GRANTED for reasons stated on the record. (Order to follow) (Court Reporter: Chantal Geneus.) (tj)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. The court will hold a hearing on [8], the government's motion for a temporary restraining order, at 4 p.m. today in Courtroom 14. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 9, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Section 5 Determination by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Determination Letter)(Freeman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [4] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Melody G. Chappell is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 8, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [3] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. K. Scott Brazil is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 8, 2013. (lcrc2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: 4/5/2013, Terminated: 4/9/2013 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 4/9/2013.....Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment seeking interim relief by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex A Complaint in Jones v. Beaumont ISD (E.D.TX), # (2) Declaration Ex. B-Declaration of Local Counsel Attesting to Accuracy of Representations in Motion, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Hebert, Joseph) Modified on 4/10/2013 (znmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Gerald Hebert on behalf of BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Hebert, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Melody G. Chappell, :Firm- Wells,Peyton,Greenberg & Hunt, L.L.P., :Address- 550 Fannin Street, Suite 600, Beaumont, TX 77701. Phone No. - (409) 838-2644. Fax No. - (409) 838-4713 by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- K.Scott Brazil, :Firm- Brazil & Dunn, :Address- 4201 Cypress Creek Parkway, Suite 530, Houston, Texas 77068. Phone No. - (281) 580-6310. Fax No. - (281) 580-6362 by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Motion to Convene Three-Judge CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616055259) filed by BEAUMONT INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, THOMAS PEREZ, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?