Gentleman v. Davol Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00184

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 2:10 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jolene Gentleman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Nelson Henderson +1 907 677 1234 +1 888 965 9338 dh@henderson-law.com
v.
No Logo C.R. Bard, Defendant
No Logo Davol Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Unissued Summons
      Unissued summons re Defendant Davol, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant C.R. Bard)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
        NOTICE of Related Case by Jolene Gentleman (Henderson, David) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
          Civil Cover Sheet. (Henderson, David) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2561865.), filed by Jolene Gentleman.(Henderson, David) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?