J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Otero
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Carolina District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00814-JFA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 2:25 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Default Judgment, awarding the plaintiff a total of Twenty-Seven Thousand Eight Hundred Forty Eight Dollars and Seventy-Five Cents ($27,848.75). Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/05/2011.(bshr, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER granting in part 11 Motion to Strike, striking Caribbean Food's letter from the record, to the extent it attempts to serve as its answer and directing Defendant Caribbean Food Inc to obtain counsel within 30 days. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/20/2011.(bshr, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?