Whitman County v. Purdue Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00252
District Judge Stanley A Bastian, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 4:56 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Whitman County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gretchen Freeman Cappio +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 gcappio@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Smith Gaffney +1 206 623 1900 agaffney@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erika M Keech +1 206 623 1900 ekeech@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David J. Ko +1 206 623 1900 dko@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Derek W Loeser +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dloeser@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Parke Mensher +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dmensher@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by whitman.wa.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Denis P Tracy +1 509 397 6250 +1 509 397 5659 denist@co.whitman.wa.us
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd"
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order Transferring Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
      NOTICE by Whitman County Related Case N.D. Ohio 1:17-md-02804-DAP (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2958140) Jury Demand. Filed by Whitman County. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 60 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?