Imperial Sanitation v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00682
District Judge Sterling Johnson Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 11:04 AM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Imperial Sanitation Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Snitow Kanfer Holtzer & Millus LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Franklyn Harvey Snitow +1 212 317 8500 +1 212 317 1308 fsnitow@skhllp.com
v.
No Logo City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Binder +1 212 788 0818 +1 212 791 9714 rbinder@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Trade Waste Commission of the City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Binder +1 212 788 0818 +1 212 791 9714 rbinder@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [17-1] appeal withdrawn. It is stipulated that the appeal is withdrawn without costs and without attorneys'fees. Issued as mandate on 8/15/97. Judge notified. Ackn mailed. USCA # 97-7450. (Gonzalez, Mary) (Entered: 08/20/1997)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT for City of New York, The Trade Waste against Imperial Sanitation. The Dft's Motion For Summary Judgment is granted; and, that the complaint is dismissed. c/m (appeals package sent) (copy of order and judgment sent to Mag. Mann) () (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 07/09/1997)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the pltf. has failed to present any genuine issue of material fact and the deft. is entitled to a judgment as a matter of law. For the reasons stated above, the defts. motion for summary judgment is granted, and the case is dismissed. ( signed by Judge Sterling Johnson Jr. on 6/23/97). Forwarded to Pro Se for Judgment. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Acknowledgment from USCA received Index: [17-1] appeal. Unsigned. Dated 5/27/97. (McGee, Maryann) (Entered: 05/30/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          USCA Scheduling Order: [17-1] appeal Appeal record due by 5/28/07 . USCA Number: 97-7450 Appellant's brief due 6/4/97. Appellee's brief due 7/7/97. Argument set for 7/28/97. (McGee, Maryann) (Entered: 05/08/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            LETTER dated 4/18/97 from Robin Binder to Judge Johnson, providing the Court with a copy of the recent decision of the New York State Supreme Court, New York Count, dismissing 3 Article 73 proceedings in which the respective petitioners challanged the denial of their waiver applications by the New York City Trade Waste Commission. (DiTomasso, Mike) (Entered: 04/23/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Imperial Sanitation Fee Paid $ 105.00 Receipt # 194065 Notice of Appeal and certified copy of docket sent appealing [0-0] endorse order. Affidavit of service attached. Judge notified. (McGee, Maryann) Modified on 04/22/1997 (Entered: 04/22/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Reply Declaration by Chad A. Vignola responding to pltfs. papers submitted in opposition to defts. cross-motion for summary judgment. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/16/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, The Trade Waste in further support of their [5-2] cross motion for summary judgment. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/16/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/14/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER dated 4/8/97 from Kenneth A. Kanfer to Judge Johnson, respectfully requesting that Your Honor reconsider his decision and deny defts the right to serve and file sur-reply papers. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/14/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Calendar entry: Before Judge Johnson on 4/4/97 at 2:00. Case called. Hearing held. Counsel for all sides present. Application for preliminary injunction heard & denied. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Reply Declaration of Franklyn H. Snitow in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunctive relief and in opposition to Cross-Motion to Dismiss. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/07/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF Points and Authorities in support of motion for preliminary injunctive relief and in opposition to cross-motion to dismiss or, alternatively, for summary judgment. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/07/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            LETTER dated 3/6/97 from Robin Binder to Judge Johnson, respectfully requesting permission to file a 42-page memorandum of law supporting the motion for preliminary injunction. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/14/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER that the return date of pltfs. OTSC is adjourned until 3/21/97 at 11:00; Deft. opposition papers shall be served so as to be received by pltfs. counsel on or before 3/7/97 at 5:00; Pltfs. reply papers shall be served so as to be received by defts. counsel on or before 3/19/97 at 2:00. ( signed by Judge Sterling Johnson Jr. on 3/7/97). (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/13/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Documentary Record submitted in support of defts. Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment. Volume II of II. Exhibit B - Q. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/11/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Documentary Record submitted in support of Defts. Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment. Volume I of II. Exhibit A (Exhibits 1-12). (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/11/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, The Trade Waste in support of [5-1] cross motion to dismiss, [5-2] cross motion for summary judgment and in opposition to pltfs. motion for a preliminary injunction. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/11/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION by City of New York, The Trade Waste to dismiss and for summary judgment . Motion hearing set for 11:00 3/21/97 [5-1] cross motion, set for 11:00 3/21/97 [5-2] cross motion . (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 03/11/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER dated 2/12/97 from Robin Binder to Judge Johnson, advising that the parties have a agreement to adjourned the return date of the preliminary motion. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 02/26/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM Of Points and Authorities in support of moiton for Preliminary and Temporary Injunctive Relief. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 02/14/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: why an order should not be entered enjoining and restraining the City of New York and the Commission form enforcing and implementing, pending a determination of this action. ( signed by Judge Sterling Johnson Jr. on 2/11/97). (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 02/14/1997)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued for City of New York, The Trade Waste FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 191832 (Chow, Alice) (Entered: 02/13/1997)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?