National Union Fire v. CSX Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-02543-JHY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah Susan G. Orlove +1 202 965 6100
Space Henry Brotherton Goddard, Jr. +1 202 965 6100

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
v.
No Logo Baronial Transportation Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
CSX Corporation CSX Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800
Space Maureen Donahue Yuffee +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo Csx Intermodal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo CSX Intermodal, Inc.-Motor Carrier Operations, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo CSX Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo CSX/Sea-Land Terminals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo Customized Transportation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo Customized Transportation, LTD., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
No Logo O-O Truck Sales, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth N. Bass, III +1 202 962 4800

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Archibald +1 410 244 7525 +1 410 244 7742 jkarchibald@venable.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/14/1994
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 6/16/1999
Origin 4
Reopened 8/11/1998
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 96-1226:[], 97-2657:[], 99-2018(CaseMgr.CarinaDom[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 86 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto. Re: [84-1] appeal by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 USCA Case Number
    USCA Case Number Re: [84-1] appeal by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. USCA NUMBER: 99-2018 (Case Mgr. Carina Domeika) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 85 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Certificate of Clerk
      Copy of Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [84-1] appeal by defendantssssssss (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
        Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [84-1] appeal by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. (Appeal forms mailed to counsel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 84 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation . Fee Status: (Filing fee paid)(c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 83 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER GRANTING Motion of Plaintiff for a Declaratory Judgment and ENTERED Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 6/16/99 ) (c/m 6/16/99-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 82 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 6/16/99 ) (c/m 6/16/99-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Terminated Case
                Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/7/1998 Motion Hearing
                  Motion hearing re: Remand of the Fourth Circuit. Argument of counsel; held sub-curia. (Reporter: ER - T. Stover) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 81 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998, Terminated: 10/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [81-1] motion of Defendants for Kenneth C. Bass III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 10/2/98 ) (c/m 10/6/98-jan) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/07/1998
                      LREF
                      Blank 81 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998, Terminated: 10/5/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                      MOTION by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. for Kenneth C. Bass III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Fee Paid Receipt #B152670) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/07/1998
                        LREF
                        Blank 80 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Response
                        MEMORANDUM ON REMAND by CSX Corporation, et al and Exhibits A-F. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/07/1998
                          LREF
                          Blank 79 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Response
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM ON REMAND by National Union Fire and Attachment. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/07/1998
                            LREF
                            Blank 78 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM "SETTING" Date for Hearing. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 8/11/98 ) (c/m 8/11/98-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/12/1998
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Case Reopened
                              Case reopened (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 77 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998, Terminated: 6/16/1999 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE by National Union Fire to [75-1] motion for Hearing by CSX Corporation. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 76 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 USCA Mandate
                                  JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "VACATING" the Judgment of the District Court and "REMANDING" Case for further proceedings consistent with the opinion attached hereto. Re: [72-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 75 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Motion for Hearing
                                    MOTION by CSX Corporation, et al for Hearing . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/18/1997, Terminated: 6/16/1999 USCA Case Number
                                      USCA Case Number Re: [72-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation USCA NUMBER: 97-2657: -> (Jean St. John is the case manager at the court of appeals): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 74 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 Order
                                        ORDER (copy) of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit, "AMENDING" its opinion filed April 14, 1997, as therein more particularly set forth (re: 4CCA# 96-1226). (jmk, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/30/1997
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 73 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: 12/2/1997 Certificate of Clerk
                                          Copy of Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [72-1] appeal by defendantssssssss (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: 12/2/1997, Terminated: 6/16/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [72-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation (Appeal packet mailed to counsel 11/21/97 akc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 72 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 11/21/1997, Terminated: 7/27/1998 Notice of Appeal
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. . Fee Status: (Filing fee paid) Appeal record due on 12/21/97 (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 71 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: 11/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER "ENTERED" Judgment in favor of Plaintiff. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 11/14/97 ) (c/m 11/14/97-Chambers) (MICROFILMED 11/17/97) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: 11/17/1997 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 11/14/97 ) (c/m 11/14/97-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: 11/17/1997 Terminated Case
                                                    Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY by National Union Fire to Defendant's response to their [64-1] motion on Remand to Exclude Documents Not in the Trial Record. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997, Terminated: 3/3/1998 Response
                                                        SURREPLY BRIEF ON REMAND by National Union Fire and Exhibit A. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          MEMORANDUM by CSX Intermodal, Inc. in opposition to [64-1] motion on Remand to Exclude Documents Not in the Trial Record by National Union Fire. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Response
                                                            MEMORANDUM IN REPLY by CSX Intermodal, Inc. to [65-1] response by National Union Fire. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Response
                                                              RESPONSE (BRIEF) by National Union Fire on Remand; Notebook of Exhibits and Video Tape. (c/s) (EXHIBITS AND VIDEO TAPE FILED SEPARATELY) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire on Remand to Exclude Documents Not in the Trial Record . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                  MEMORANDUM "SETTING" Dates for Briefing Schedule. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 6/4/97 ) (c/m by chambers) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Response
                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, et al concerning Dispositive issues on Remand and Exhibits. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Response
                                                                      APPELLANTS' REPLY to Appellee National Union's Objections to CSX's Request for Costs and Exhibit 1. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/19/1997 Order
                                                                        ORDER (copy) of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit, "AWARDING" Appellants $1,896.63 in costs, copy of Bill of Cost attached hereto. (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 Response
                                                                          RESPONSE (OBJECTION) by National Union Fire to [57-1] Bill of costs by CSX Corporation. (c/s Chambers & Staff Atty) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/14/1997 Case Reopened
                                                                            Case reopened (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 USCA Mandate
                                                                              JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "VACATING" the Judgment of the District Court and "REMANDING" case for proceedings, consistent with the opinion attached hereto. (c/s) Re: [52-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Bill of Costs
                                                                                Bill of costs by CSX Corporation, et al. (c/s Staff Atty and Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/25/1996 Certificate of Clerk
                                                                                  Certificate of Clerk (copy), "Certifying" record as complete for appeal purposes for [52-1] appeal by defendants. (copies mailed). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/25/1996 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPTS (2 volumes), filed [52-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Corporation for dates of 11/20/95 and 11/21/95, taken before Senior Judge Young; Appeal record due on 5/10/96. {Filed Separately): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/4/1996 Remark
                                                                                      Copy of transcript order from of Defendant ordering treanscripts. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1996, Entered: 2/27/1996, Terminated: 6/16/1999 USCA Case Number
                                                                                        USCA Case Number Re: [52-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation USCA NUMBER: 96-1226: (Jean St. John is the case manager): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996 Remark
                                                                                          Copy of transcript order form of defendant, ordering transcript proceedings as therein set forth. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996, Terminated: 5/8/1997 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. . Fee Status: Paid: (Receipt #129547): Appeal record due on 3/16/96. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996, Terminated: 6/16/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                                              Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [52-1] appeal by Customized LTD., Customized, Baronial, CSX/Sea-Land, O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX Services, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Corporation. (d/s, t.p.o.f. and copies mailed). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL Order submitted by plaintiff and defendants. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER that judgment is ENTERED in favor of plaintiff. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (c/m Chambers) (microfilmed 1/19/96) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                      Exhibit list by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 Terminated Case
                                                                                                        Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Response
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land to [46-1] Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Remark
                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Post-Trial reply brief. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Correspondence
                                                                                                              CORRESPONDENCE RE: Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Correspondence
                                                                                                                CORRESPONDENCE RE: Defendants' Post-Trial Memorandum. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995, Terminated: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [43-1] motion for Maureen Donahue Yuffee to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (fee paid $50.00) (c/m 11/27/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995, Terminated: 11/27/1995 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION by CSX Corporation for Maureen Donahue Yuffee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Oral Motion
                                                                                                                      Oral MOTION in open court by CSX Corporation for Judgment on partial findings made pursuant to FRCP 52 made at the conclusion of the Plaintiff's Case-In-Chief , DENIED and Oral moton of defnedant for Judgment on Partial Findings pursuant to FRCP 52 renewed at the conclusion of all the Evidence DENIED. Held Sub-Curia. E.R. Thompson (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Oral Motion
                                                                                                                        Non JuryDay 2 - Oral MOTION in open court by National Union Fire for judgment on partial findings pursuant to FRCP 52 made at the end of Plaintiff's case in chief , DENIED and Oral motion of Plaintiff for Judgment on Partial Findings pursuant to FRCP 52 Renewed at the conclusion of all the Evidence DENIED. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                          Non Jury Day 1 - Oral Order DENYING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ON AND DISCUSSION OF INTENT; AND DENYING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ON WHETHER LOADING A SEMITRAILER ONTO A RAILCAR IS RAILROAD OPERATION. E.R. Thompson (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 Correspondence
                                                                                                                            CORRESPONDENCE RE: Defendants Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony of Reggie Moore. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                              Sur-Reply by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [29-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on and discussion of intent (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Marginal ORDER dated 11/15/95 denying [35-1] motion for Pre-Trial Conference denying [35-2] motion for Continuance of Trial ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995, Terminated: 1/19/1996 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [29-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on and discussion of intent (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by National Union Fire to response to [30-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on whether loading a semitrailer onto a railcar is a railroad operation (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY by National Union Fire to response to [29-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on and discussion of intent (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995, Terminated: 1/19/1996 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [35-2] motion for Continuance of Trial (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995, Terminated: 11/16/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire for Pre-Trial Conference , and for Continuance of Trial (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995, Terminated: 1/19/1996 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [30-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on whether loading a semitrailer onto a railcar is a railroad operation (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                Defendant's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [29-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on and discussion of intent (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995, Terminated: 11/20/1995 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire in Limine to exclude evidence on whether loading a semitrailer onto a railcar is a railroad operation (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire in Limine to exclude evidence on and discussion of intent (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        Surreply RESPONSE by National Union Fire in opposition to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Marginal ORDER denying [21-1] motion to Compel responses to discovery and production of documents ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (c/m 10/16/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Marginal ORDER denying [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (c/m 10/16/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (c/m 10/16/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Marginal ORDER denying [12-1] motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of William E. Dillard Jr. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young ) (c/m 10/16/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995, Terminated: 1/19/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  FURTHER RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. to [21-1] motion of plaintiff to Compel responses to discovery and production of documents (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by National Union Fire in support of [21-1] motion of plaintiff to Compel responses to discovery and production of documents. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995, Terminated: 10/16/1995 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire to Compel responses to discovery and production of documents and exhibits 1 thru 10. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land to response to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by National Union Fire to response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by National Union Fire in opposition to [14-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (file separately) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by National Union Fire to response to [12-1] motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of William E. Dillard Jr. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment and attachments. (file separately) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. in opposition to [12-1] motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of William E. Dillard Jr. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995, Terminated: 10/16/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized, Customized LTD. for Partial Summary Judgment and attachments. (file separately) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995, Terminated: 10/16/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire for Summary Judgment , and Request for Hearing. (filed separately) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/31/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995, Terminated: 10/16/1995 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Plaintiff National Union Fire in Limine to Exclude Testimony of William E. Dillard Jr. and Exhibits 1 through 3 filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by National Union Fire. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/04/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 04/19/95 )(c/m: 04/25/95 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/29/1994 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., Motor Carrier, CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, Baronial, Customized and Customized LTD. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 12/8/94). (c/m by Chambers 12/8/94) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Pre-Trial Submission of Proposed Schedule. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Conference held before Young, S.J. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994, Terminated: 12/5/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting [6-1] Joint Motion to Extend Time for All Defendants to File an Initial Response, Set Answer deadline to 12/19/94 for Customized LTD., for Customized, for Baronial, for CSX/Sea-Land, for O-O Truck Sales, Inc, for CSX Services, Inc., for Motor Carrier, for CSX Intermodal, Inc., for CSX Corporation ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 12/5/94) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994, Terminated: 12/5/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION by All Parties to Extend Time for All Defendants to File an Initial Response . (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER/LETTER "SETTING" Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, December 6, 1994, at 4:45 p.m. ( signed by Sr. Judge Joseph H. Young 11/3/94). (c/m by Chambers 11/3/94) (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONSES issued for CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal, Inc., CSX Services, Inc., O-O Truck Sales, Inc, CSX/Sea-Land, and Customized Transportation, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONSES (30 days) issued for Motor Carrier, and Baronial (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (60 days) issued for Customized LTD. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 114684 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?