United States v. In the Matter of the Search of An I-Phone Model A1533 seized from Danny Gomes Austin on June 8, 2018
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-01170
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 6:49 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Wortmann, Jr. +1 617 748 3207 +1 617 748 3963 john.wortmann@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo In the Matter of the Search of An I-Phone Model A1533 seized from Danny Gomes Austin on June 8, 2018, Defendant
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Service made on 7/27/2018 in case as to In the Matter of the Search of An I-Phone Model A1533 seized from Danny Gomes Austin on June 8, 2018. (Wortmann, John) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to In the Matter of the Search of An I-Phone Model A1533 seized from Danny Gomes Austin on June 8, 2018 ; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPLICATION and Affidavit for Search Warrant as to In the Matter of the Search of An I-Phone Model A1533 seized from Danny Gomes Austin on June 8, 2018 (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 5 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?