Frost v. Suffolk Construction Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11578

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2021 at 6:28 PM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dawn Frost, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheff Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frank J. Federico, Jr. +1 617 227 7000 +1 617 227 8833 ffederico@shefflaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthieu J. Parenteau +1 617 227 7000 mparenteau@shefflaw.com
No Logo Eric Frost, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheff Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frank J. Federico, Jr. +1 617 227 7000 +1 617 227 8833 ffederico@shefflaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthieu J. Parenteau +1 617 227 7000 mparenteau@shefflaw.com
v.
No Logo Suffolk Construction Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Strike
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE by Suffolk Construction Company, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (O'Connell, Brian) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kinsella, Devan) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc..(Farrey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7247733 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Sheet)(Farrey, Thomas) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/26/2018 to correct fillable PDF format) (Kinsella, Devan). (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?