Al Fahham v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01331

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2018 at 2:47 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Salih H. Al Fahham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Klein, Bart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bart Klein +1 206 624 3787 +1624637 +16 624 6371 bart.klein@bartklein.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Pompeo"
No Logo Simon Henshaw, Defendant
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1329
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/8/2018, Entered: None Complaint
      COMPLAINT in the Nature of Mandamus, Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5463946) Attorney Bart Klein added to party Salih H. Al Fahham(pty:pla), filed by Salih H. Al Fahham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Klein, Bart) (Entered: 09/08/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 3 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?