West v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00160

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2019 at 6:55 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth Ann West Gallardo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime M Diez +1 956 544 3565 +1 956 550 0006 jaimemdiez@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com
No Logo Ronald Joseph West, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime M Diez +1 956 544 3565 +1 956 550 0006 jaimemdiez@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elisabeth Lisa S Brodyaga +1 956 421 3226 +1 956 421 3423 lisabrodyaga@aol.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher D Pineda +1 956 548 2554 +1 956 548 2776 christopher.pineda@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher D Pineda +1 956 548 2554 +1 956 548 2776 christopher.pineda@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of settlement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - CivilCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference (Doc. 10) reset for 12/19/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera, filed. (sespinoza, 1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
            AGREED ORDER. Ordered that defendants are to file their responsive pleading as to Plaintiffs' complaint by 12/10/2018. Status Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera. Ordered that plaintiff Ronald Joseph West is to provide proof of paternity as to Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann West Gallardo to the US Department of State within thirty (30) days. Ordered that plaintiff Elizabeth Ann West Gallardo will be paroled into the United States for a period of sixty (60) days, which begins on Friday, October 19, 2018, when the parties have coordinated Elizabeth's parole to occur.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Notice of settlement
              NOTICE of Settlement by Mike Pompeo, United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2018, Entered: 10/14/2018 Exhibits
                Supplemental EXHIBITS re: 1 Complaint by Ronald Joseph West, Elizabeth Ann West Gallardo, filed.(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/14/2018, Entered: 10/14/2018 Brief
                  BRIEF In support of motion for preliminary injunction re: 1 Complaint by Ronald Joseph West, Elizabeth Ann West Gallardo, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tamaulipas Code, # 2 Exhibit Translation)(Brodyaga, Elisabeth)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                    NOTICE of Appearance by AUSA Christopher D. Pineda on behalf of Mike Pompeo, United States of America, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER entered. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                        ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 SEALED Exhibits
                          Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Other Notice
                            NOTICE Proposed Order TRO by Ronald Joseph WEST, Elizabeth Ann WEST GALLARDO, filed. (Diez, Jaime)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21032395) filed by Ronald Joseph WEST, Elizabeth Ann WEST GALLARDO.(Diez, Jaime)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued as to Mike Pompeo, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(scastillo, 1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?