Green v. Wachovia Mortgage FSB
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-03047-RMP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2018 at 3:35 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Defendant's Motion for attorney's fees ECF No. 90 is GRANTED. The Court awards Defendant Wachovia $91,832.50 in attorney's fees. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT in favor of all Defendants against James A Green. (PL, Case Administrator)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER CLOSING CASE; dismissing all counts as ordered in ECF No. 87 . Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND. Granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting 48 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, within THIRTY DAYS of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LLH, Operations Clk)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND denying 11 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?