Guyer v. MGT Capital Investments, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-09228-ER
District Judge Edgardo Ramos, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 12, 2021 at 11:37 AM EDT (7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dae C. Paek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald J Enright +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 denright@zlk.com
Space Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com
No Logo Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald J Enright +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 denright@zlk.com
Space Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com
No Logo Kirt Guyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Monica Paek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald J Enright +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 denright@zlk.com
Space Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com
No Logo Peter Oh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald J Enright +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 denright@zlk.com
Space Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com
No Logo Sam Koo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald J Enright +1 202 524 4290 +1 202 333 2121 denright@zlk.com
Space Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com
v.
No Logo Honig, Barry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barry C. Honig"
Officer/Director, Cody Resources, Inc.
Officer/Director, Excel Global, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sienna Resources, Inc.
Officer/Director, Passport Potash Inc
Officer/Director, Smd Group Inc
Officer/Director, Aspenbio, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sunair Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Strategic American Oil Corp
Officer/Director, Scorpio Mining Corp
No Logo McAfee, John David, Defendant
Officially listed as "John McAfee"
No Logo O'Rourke, III, John R., Defendant
Officially listed as "John O'Rourke III"
Officer/Director, Aspenbio, Inc.
No Logo John Stetson, Defendant
No Logo Groussman Mark, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mark Groussman"
Officer/Director, Verve Ventures Inc
Officer/Director, Tone in Twenty
No Logo MGT Capital Investments, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Michael Ketani +1 212 715 9355 dketani@kramerlevin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Patrick Coffey +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 SCoffey@kramerlevin.com
Space Jeffrey William Davis +1 212 715 9172 +1 212 715 7509 jdavis@kramerlevin.com
No Logo Michael Brauser, Defendant
No Logo Ladd, Robert B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert B. Ladd"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall R Lee +1 310 883 6485 randall.lee@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher W Johnstone +1 650 858 6147 +1 415 858 6100 Chris.Johnstone@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Robert S. Lowrey, Defendant
No Logo Alex Pine, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Isador Gabel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo James Benhart, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Jean, Olivier, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Mark A. Couvillion, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Simon Tse, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Southern California Plaintiffs Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com
No Logo Steve Heitz, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Sadeh sadeh@halpersadeh.com
No Logo The MGT Investor Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragar, Eagel Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MELISSA ANN FORTUNATO +1 203 788 3165 fortunato@bespc.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/9/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 5/27/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
118-cv-08175-ER
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ECF,RELATED
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 judgmentCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT: WHEREAS, this Court has duly considered Lead Plaintiffs' motion for final approval of the Settlement, the affidavits, declarations and memoranda of law submitted in support thereof, and all of the submissions and arguments presented with respect to the proposed Settlement (including those presented at the Settlement Fairness Hearing) to determine if the Settlement and the terms and provisions of the Stipulation are fair; reasonable and adequate, and whether a final Judgment should be entered in this Action based upon the Stipulation; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: This Judgment incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation, and all capitalized terms used in this Judgment that are not otherwise defined herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation. This Court has jurisdiction of the subject matter of this Action and over all of the Settling Parties and all Class Members; as further set forth herein. There is no just reason for delay in the entry of the Judgment, and immediate entry thereof by the Clerk of Court is expressly directed. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/27/2020) (Attachments: # (1) Appeal Package) (mro)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Order on Motion for attorney fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Fairness Hearing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Fairness Hearing held on 5/27/2020. Lead Plaintiffs' counsel appeared by telephone. Counsel for Defendant MGT Capital Investments, Inc. appeared by telephone. Counsel for Defendant Robert B. Ladd appeared by telephone. Settlement approved. Final judgment will be entered. (jar)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Declaration
        DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright Updating the Court as to Requests for Exclusion and Objections to the Settlement and Attaching a Proposed Order Granting Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, # (2) Affidavit of Claims Administrator).(Enright, Donald)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [69] Letter filed by Dae C. Paek, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Monica Paek, Sam Koo, Peter Oh. ENDORSEMENT: The Settlement Hearing will proceed by teleconference. The parties are directed to call (877) 411-9748; access code: 3029857. Plaintiffs' counsel is further directed to provide this call-in information to objectors, to the extent there are any, no later than May 26, 2020 at 5:00 PM. ( Telephone Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/15/2020) (mro)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020 LetterCourt Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Donald J. Enright dated 5/15/2020 re: Settlement Hearing. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Enright, Donald)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 68 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [67] Motion for Donald James Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Authorize
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020, Terminated: 5/12/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                  MOTION for Donald James Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19748678. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Text of Proposed Order).(Enright, Donald)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Shannon L. Hopkins dated May 7, 2020 re: Settlement Exclusion Requests. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G).(Hopkins, Shannon)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [67] MOTION for Donald James Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19748678. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                              DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright on behalf of Levi & Korsinsky, LLP in Support re: [59] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses.. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C).(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                  DECLARATION of Josephine Bravata in Support re: [58] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation., [59] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses.. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Authorize
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                      DECLARATION of Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Monica Paek, and Dae C. Paek in Support re: [58] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation., [59] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses.. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                          DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: [58] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation., [59] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses.. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [59] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses. . Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [58] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation. . Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020, Terminated: 5/27/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                                MOTION for Attorney Fees and Payment of Litigation Expenses. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020, Terminated: 5/27/2020 motion for settlement
                                                  MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek..(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 order on motion for settlementCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [51] Motion for Settlement. The motion is GRANTED. The Court hereby Orders as follows: The Settlement Class is preliminarily certified, and the Settlement Agreement is Preliminarily approved. Lead Plaintiffs are conditionally certified as class representatives; Levi & Korsinsky, LLP is conditionally appointed as lead counsel for the Settlement Class; and Strategic Claims Services is appointed as the claims administrator. The form and manner of distributing of distributing the proposed Notice Materials are hereby approved. The Notice Materials will be mailed to the Settlement Class no later than thirty-one business days after entry of this Order (the "Notice Date"). The Summary Notice will be published within ten calendar days of the Notice Date. A hearing pursuant to Rule 23(e) will be held before the Court on May 27, 2020 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court, Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007, for the following purposes as further set forth in this Order. All motions in support of final approval shall be filed no later than April 22, 2020. All objections and requests for exclusion shall be filed no later than May 6, 2020. All reply papers shall be filed no later than May 20, 2020. All claim forms will be submitted no later than May 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/13/19) (yv)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: (Motions due by 4/22/2020., Responses due by 5/6/2020, Replies due by 5/20/2020.), Set/Reset Hearings: (Status Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (yv)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Phillip Kim dated December 12, 2019 re: Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Dkt. No. 53-1). Document filed by Bob Thomas. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Kim, Phillip)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John P. Coffey dated December 10, 2019 re: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Document filed by MGT Capital Investments, Inc..(Coffey, John)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                            DECLARATION of Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek in Support re: [51] MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement.. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                              DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: [51] MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement.. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, # (2) Exhibit A to Stipulation, # (3) Exhibit A-1 to Stipulation, # (4) Exhibit A-2 to Stipulation, # (5) Exhibit A-3 to Stipulation, # (6) Exhibit B to Stipulation, # (7) Firm Resume)(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [51] MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement. . Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 12/17/2019 motion for settlement
                                                                  MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek.(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/1/2019) (kv)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                      PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by MGT Capital Investments, Inc.. (Davis, Jeffrey)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against Robert B. Ladd, MGT Capital Investments, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dae C. Paek, Monica Paek, Sam Koo, Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo. Related document: [1] Complaint,.(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Amended Summons Issued
                                                                          ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Brauser, Mark Groussman, Barry C. Honig, John O'Rourke III, John Stetson. (dnh)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Barry C. Honig, John Stetson, Michael Brauser, John O'Rourke, III, Mark Groussman, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Shannon Lee Hopkins to RE-FILE Document No. [45] Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; For Summons requests previously issued to parties use the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons and reflect as "Amended". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barry C. Honig, John Stetson, Michael Brauser, John O'Rourke, III, Mark Groussman, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon) Modified on 5/10/2019 (dnh).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Shannon Lee Hopkins to RE-FILE Document No. [43] Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name in the docket entry and on the Summons PDF does not exactly match the party of record (John R. O'Rourke, III). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MGT Capital Investments, Inc. waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Barry C. Honig, John Stetson, Michael Brauser, John R. O'Rourke, III, Mark Groussman, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon) Modified on 5/9/2019 (dnh).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Shannon Lee Hopkins on behalf of Southern California Plaintiffs Group. New Address: Levi & Korsinsky, LLP, 1111 Summer Street, Suite 403, Stamford, CT, United States 06905, 203-992-4523. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Randall R Lee on behalf of Robert B. Ladd. New Address: COOLEY LLP, 1333 2nd Street, Suite 400, Santa Monica, CA, USA 90401, 310-883-6400. (Lee, Randall)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [38] Motion for Chris Johnstone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [37] Motion for Randall R. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Loretta A. Preska is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                  CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-08175-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2019. (mph)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [38] MOTION for Chris Johnstone to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16239760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [37] MOTION for Randall R. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16239475. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019, Terminated: 1/30/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                        MOTION for Chris Johnstone to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16239760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert B. Ladd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Motion, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing - California, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Johnstone, Chris)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019, Terminated: 1/30/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                          MOTION for Randall R. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16239475. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert B. Ladd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Motion, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing - California State Supreme Court, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Randall)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey William Davis on behalf of Robert S. Lowrey, MGT Capital Investments, Inc.. (Davis, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Patrick Coffey on behalf of Robert S. Lowrey, MGT Capital Investments, Inc.. (Coffey, John)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Steinberg Kennedy on behalf of Robert S. Lowrey, MGT Capital Investments, Inc.. (Kennedy, Karen)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Michael Ketani on behalf of Robert S. Lowrey, MGT Capital Investments, Inc.. (Ketani, Daniel)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                                                                    RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Shannon L. Hopkins re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-8175. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group.(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #32) - RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Shannon L. Hopkins re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-8175. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group.(Hopkins, Shannon) Modified on 1/23/2019 (ldi).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER terminating [20] Motion to Appoint ; denying [20] Motion to Approve to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s); denying [6] Motion to Appoint ; denying [9] Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying [9] Motion to Appoint ; granting [10] Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting [10] Motion to Appoint ; denying [15] Motion to Appoint ; denying [15] Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying [18] Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying [18] Motion to Appoint. Per this Court's December 3, 2018 Order [dkt. no. 23], movants Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek are appointed as lead Plaintiff [dkt. no. 10]. Their selection of Levi & Korsinky, LLP as lead counsel is approved. All other motions to appoint counsel are denied. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate all other motions to appoint lead plaintiff [dkt. nos. 6, 9, 15, 18, 20]. Counsel shall appear before the Court for a telephonic conference on January 28, 2019 at 10:00 AM. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/9/2019) (ks) Modified on 1/10/2019 (ks).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (ks)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PLAINTIFFS GROUP'S NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL re: [10] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [15] MOTION to Appoint The MGT Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C.., [6] MOTION to Appoint Alex Pine, James Benhart, and Simon Tse to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., [20] MOTION to Appoint Mark A. Couvillion and Isador Gabel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel ., [18] MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A.. MOTION to Appoint Jean Olivier to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., [9] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bernstein Liebhard. MOTION to Appoint Steve Heitz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of of Non-Opposition re: [10] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by James Benhart, Alex Pine, Simon Tse. (Guiney, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: [10] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Steve Heitz. (Sadeh, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal re: [15] MOTION to Appoint The MGT Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C... Document filed by The MGT Investor Group. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal re: [18] MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A.. MOTION to Appoint Jean Olivier to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Jean Olivier. (Kim, Phillip)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Anyone who opposes the Southern California Plaintiffs Group's appointment as lead plaintiff and their choice of lead counsel shall have two weeks to inform the Court of their objections. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/3/2018) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: [20] MOTION to Appoint Mark A. Couvillion and Isador Gabel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Mark A. Couvillion, Isador Gabel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Press Release, # (2) Exhibit B - Certification, # (3) Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # (4) Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [20] MOTION to Appoint Mark A. Couvillion and Isador Gabel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Mark A. Couvillion, Isador Gabel. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Mark A. Couvillion and Isador Gabel to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel . Document filed by Mark A. Couvillion, Isador Gabel. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [18] MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A.. MOTION to Appoint Jean Olivier to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Jean Olivier. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Kim, Phillip)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm P.A.., MOTION to Appoint Jean Olivier to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Jean Olivier. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Melissa A. Fortunato in Support re: [15] MOTION to Appoint The MGT Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C... Document filed by The MGT Investor Group. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [15] MOTION to Appoint The MGT Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C.. . Document filed by The MGT Investor Group. (Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint The MGT Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C.. Document filed by The MGT Investor Group. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fortunato, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Daniel Sadeh in Support re: [9] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bernstein Liebhard. MOTION to Appoint Steve Heitz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Steve Heitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Sadeh, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Shannon L. Hopkins in Support re: [10] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [10] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [9] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bernstein Liebhard. MOTION to Appoint Steve Heitz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Steve Heitz. (Sadeh, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Peter Oh, Kevin Joo Hoon Koo, Sam Koo, Dae C. Paek, and Monica Paek to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Southern California Plaintiffs Group. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel Bernstein Liebhard., MOTION to Appoint Steve Heitz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Steve Heitz. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadeh, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Matthew M. Guiney in Support re: [6] MOTION to Appoint Alex Pine, James Benhart, and Simon Tse to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by James Benhart, Alex Pine, Simon Tse. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit)(Guiney, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [6] MOTION to Appoint Alex Pine, James Benhart, and Simon Tse to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by James Benhart, Alex Pine, Simon Tse. (Guiney, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Alex Pine, James Benhart, and Simon Tse to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Alex Pine, James Benhart, Simon Tse.(Guiney, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Kirt Guyer. (Hood, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Brauser, Mark Groussman, Barry C. Honig, Robert B. Ladd, Robert S. Lowrey, MGT Capital Investments, Inc., John McAfee, John O'Rourke III, John Stetson. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kirt Guyer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MGT Capital Investments, Inc., Robert B. Ladd, John McAfee, Robert S. Lowrey, Barry C. Honig, John Stetson, Michael Brauser, John O'Rourke III, and Mark Groussman, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by Kirt Guyer. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Michael Brauser, Mark Groussman, Barry C. Honig, Robert B. Ladd, Robert S. Lowrey, MGT Capital Investments, Inc., John McAfee, John O'Rourke III, John Stetson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15699821)Document filed by Kirt Guyer.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?