J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Larrison
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01566-JAD-NJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2021 at 1:24 PM ST (4.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER adopting the magistratejudges report and recommendation 24 . This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: The parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report by 1/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER that 15 and 16 Motions for Demand for Security of Costs are GRANTED; plaintiff has until April 29, 2016, to present to the Clerk of Court $500.00 for each of the demands filed (for a total of $1,000.00) in lawful money as security in compliance with NRS 18.130(1). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?