CHEN v. Walsh, Sr.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-23894
District Judge K Michael Moore, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 8, 2021 at 10:23 AM ST (2.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEXIONG HU, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo DONGLIN GU, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo HEZHANG CHEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo JIALIN HAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo LIJUAN FAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo PEIXUAN WANG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo TIANJUN LI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo WEN SHEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo WEN ZHANG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo XIAOYUN CHEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo XIUQING WANG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo YANG ZHAO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
No Logo YI GAO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Damian & Valori, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Kenneth Dante Murena +1 305 371 3960 +1 305 371 3965 kmurena@dvllp.com
v.
No Logo CONNECT INSURANCE GROUP, INC., Defendant
No Logo JJW CONSULTANCY, LTD., Defendant
No Logo Joseph J. Walsh, Sr., Defendant
No Logo ROYAL PALM DEVELOPMENT I, LLC, Defendant
No Logo ROYAL PALM TOWN CENTER IV, LLLP, Defendant
No Logo South Atlantic Regional Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo UNITED STATES REGIONAL ECONOMIC AUTHORITY, LLC, Defendant
No Logo USREDA HOLDINGS, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Notification of Ninety Days Expiring
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Status Conference
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Joseph J. Walsh, Sr.. (dj) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Joseph J. Walsh, Sr. by HEZHANG CHEN, XIAOYUN CHEN, LIJUAN FAN, YI GAO, DONGLIN GU, JIALIN HAN, DEXIONG HU, TIANJUN LI, WEN SHEN, PEIXUAN WANG, XIUQING WANG, WEN ZHANG, YANG ZHAO re 1 Complaint,,, filed by JIALIN HAN, WEN ZHANG, XIUQING WANG, DEXIONG HU, YANG ZHAO, YI GAO, LIJUAN FAN, PEIXUAN WANG, WEN SHEN, TIANJUN LI, XIAOYUN CHEN, HEZHANG CHEN, DONGLIN GU (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s) Joseph J. Walsh, Sr.) (Murena, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANDREA M. SIMONTON. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. ยง 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton's discovery procedures, which can be found on the Southern District of Florida website, www.flsd.uscourts.gov, under the tab for Judge Simonton, in the drop down menu Judge Information. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/21/2018. (jm01) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuits Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/21/2018. (jm01) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dj) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (dj) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning/Transferring Case
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Clerks Notice Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (dj) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against CONNECT INSURANCE GROUP, INC., JJW CONSULTANCY, LTD., ROYAL PALM DEVELOPMENT I, LLC, ROYAL PALM TOWN CENTER IV, LLLP, SOUTH ATLANTIC REGIONAL CENTER, LLC, UNITED STATES REGIONAL ECONOMIC AUTHORITY, LLC, USREDA HOLDINGS, LLC, Joseph J. Walsh, Sr.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11012700, filed by WEN ZHANG, WEN SHEN, PEIXUAN WANG, XIAOYUN CHEN, TIANJUN LI, JIALIN HAN, HEZHANG CHEN, LIJUAN FAN, XIUQING WANG, YI GAO, YANG ZHAO, DEXIONG HU, DONGLIN GU. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) South Atlantic Regional Center, LLC, # 3 Summon(s) Royal Palm Development I, LLC, # 4 Summon(s) United States Regional Economic Authority, LLC, # 5 Summon(s) USRED Holdings, LLC, # 6 Summon(s) JJW Consultancy, Ltd., # 7 Summon(s) Connect Insurance Group, Inc., # 8 Summon(s) Royal Palm Town Center IV, LLLP)(Murena, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?