Town of Millbury, Massachusetts v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-40148
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 9:05 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Town of Millbury, Massachusetts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodman Rodman & Sandman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Sandman +1 781 322 3720 +1 781 324 6906 rsandman@rrslaw.net
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS Health Corporation, Individually,, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
No Logo Rite Aid Corporation, Individually,, Defendant
No Logo Rite Aid of Massachusetts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Individually, Defendant
No Logo Walmart Stores East, LP, Individually, Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 55 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7302434 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Millbury, Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Category Form)(Sandman, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/5/2018) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/5/2018) (Burgos, Sandra). (Entered: 09/04/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 33 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?