Smith v. Big Picture Loans, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01651
Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated Today at 5:44 PM (51.3 minutes ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Lee Smith, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 209 S.W. Oak Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven C. Berman +1 503 227 1600 +1 503 227 6840 sberman@stollberne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Caddell & Chapman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Allen Caddell +1 713 751 0400 mac@caddellchapman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Cynthia Bodendieck Chapman +1 713 751 0400 +1 713 751 0906 cbc@caddellchapman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY John B. Scofield - PHV, Jr. +1 713 751 0400 +1 713 751 0906 jbs@caddellchapman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy E Tabor +1 713 751 0400 aet@caddellchapman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steve Douglas Larson +1 503 227 1600 +1 503 227 6840 slarson@stollberne.com
v.
No Logo Ascension Technologies, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Big Picture Loans, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Matt Martorello, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1965
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Findings & Recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None reply to motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Exhibit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Findings & Recommendation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Attorney Substitution
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Attorney Substitution
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notification of CM/ECF Account for Amy E. Tabor (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: aetabor. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy E. Tabor for Richard Lee Smith, Jr. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5557346. issued. Signed on 9/20/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael A. Caddell (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: macaddell. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Caddell for Richard Lee Smith, Jr. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 979-5557337 issued. Signed on 9/20/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notification of CM/ECF Account for John B. Scofield, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jbscofield. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of John B. Scofield, Jr for Richard Lee Smith, Jr. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5557279 issued. Signed on 9/20/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Cynthia B. Chapman (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cbchapman. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cynthia B. Chapman for Richard Lee Smith, Jr. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5557330 issued. Signed on 9/20/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy E. Tabor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5557346. Filed by Richard Lee Smith, Jr. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael A. Caddell . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5557337. Filed by Richard Lee Smith, Jr. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cynthia B. Chapman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5557330. Filed by Richard Lee Smith, Jr. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John B. Scofield, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5557279. Filed by Richard Lee Smith, Jr. (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Summons Issued Electronically as to Ascension Technologies, LLC, Big Picture Loans, LLC, Matt Martorello. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              Complaint. Class Action Allegation Complaint Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5549469 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Lee Smith, Jr against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons). (Larson, Steve) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?