Cono v. Richards
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01845

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2019 at 11:23 AM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leo Cono, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leo Cono

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leo Cono
v.
No Logo Regina Richards, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten TimeCourt Filing
              ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Clerical Mistakes is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond and 10 Motion to Extend Production of Exhibits are DENIED, as moot. Plaintiff shall have until 12/10/2018 to file his Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None order on report and recommendationCourt Filing
                ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 5 the Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is instructed to file 1 -1 the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims agai nst all Nonresident Defendants are DISMISSED for lack of personal jurisdiction and venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claim against the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria Navarro is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                    ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend, in order to allege viable claims against the Nevada Defendants. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against all Nonresident Defendants be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction and venue. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that P laintiff's claim against the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria Navarro be dismissed, with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Objections to R&R due by 10/23/2018. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Leo Cono. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (RT)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?