District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Virginia Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Courthouse News Service v. Schaefer
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00391
District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 3:27 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Courthouse News Service, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Heather Goldman +1 202 508 6000 +1 202 508 6200 heather.goldman@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Bryan Harrison +1 202 508 6000 +1 202 508 6200 bryan.harrison@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willcox & Savage PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Conrad Moss Shumadine +1 757 628 5500 +1 757 628 5566 cshumadine@wilsav.com
v.
No Logo George E. Schaefer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompsonmcmullan, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Gordon Matheson +1 804 698 5933 +1 804 780 1813 mmatheson@t-mlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Prince, IV +1 804 649 7545 +1 804 780 1813 wprince@t-mlaw.com
No Logo Jacqueline C. Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompsonmcmullan, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Gordon Matheson +1 804 698 5933 +1 804 780 1813 mmatheson@t-mlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Daniel Prince, IV +1 804 649 7545 +1 804 780 1813 wprince@t-mlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Agreed ORDER granting 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/30/2018. (clou) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (unopposed) by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2018 at 03:00 PM in Norfolk Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/24/18. (lbax, ) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Memorandum in Support re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 12(b)(7), and 21 (CORRECTED) filed by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Matheson, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 12(b)(7), and 21 (CORRECTED) by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Matheson, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of George E. Schaefer, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jacqueline C. Smith)(Prince, William) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 12(b)(7), and 21 (CORRECTED WITH EXHIBITS) filed by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Matheson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 12(b)(7), and 21 filed by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Matheson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 12(b)(7), and 21 by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Matheson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Gordon Matheson on behalf of George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith (Matheson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Agreed ORDER re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and for Implementation of Briefing Schedule Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (See order for details). Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/8/2018. (clou ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Bryan Harrison as to Courthouse News Service. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 08/7/18. (tlev, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Heather Goldman as to Courthouse News Service. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/7/18. (tlev, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 6 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Hibsher as to Courthouse News Service. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/7/18. (tlev, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and for Implementation of Briefing Schedule Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Agreed Order))(Prince, William) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courthouse News Service. Jacqueline C. Smith served on 7/23/2018. (jjon) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courthouse News Service. George E. Schaefer served on 7/23/2018. (clou) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Goldman and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6188534. by Courthouse News Service. (Shumadine, Conrad) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bryan Harrison and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6188523. by Courthouse News Service. (Shumadine, Conrad) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Hibsher and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6188497. by Courthouse News Service. (Shumadine, Conrad) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Memorandum in Support re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Authorities)(Shumadine, Conrad) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A (Girdner Dec.), # 2 Ex. B (Abbott Dec.), # 3 Ex. C (Davis Dec.))(Shumadine, Conrad) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Two (2) Summonses Issued as to George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Courthouse News Service. (epri) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT against George E. Schaefer, Jacqueline C. Smith ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6185804.), filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Letter)(epri) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?