Finishing Solutions LLC v. Bayer AG
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01391
District Judge R David Proctor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2019 at 11:40 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Finishing Solutions LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 2001 Parkplace North

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Frohsin & Barger LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Fredrick Barger, Jr. +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 jim@frohsinbarger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Cory Bradley +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2811 pdh-efiling@pittmandutton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite #1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J Elliott Walthall +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 elliott@frohsinbarger.com
v.
BASF Corporation BASF Corporation, Defendant
No Logo BASF SE, Defendant
No Logo Bayer AG, Defendant
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Covestro Llc, Defendant
No Logo Dow Chemical Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carl Stanley Burkhalter +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 cburkhalter@maynardcooper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Patrick Moltz +1 205 254 1873 emoltz@maynardcooper.com
No Logo Huntsman Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Huntsman International LLC, Defendant
No Logo MCNS, Defendant
No Logo MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Defendant
No Logo Mitsui Chemicals America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Western District of Pennsylvania for inclusion in MDL 2862; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Western District of Pennsylvania. (KAM) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    TEXT ORDER; This case is before the court on the parties' Agreed Motion to Extend All Deadlines Until After the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rules on Pending Motion for Transfer 9 . For good cause shown, the motion 9 is GRANTED. All deadlines are EXTENDED and the case is STAYED until 28 calendar days after the JPML rules on the pending Motion for Transfer. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/14/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S Burkhalter on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Burkhalter, Carl) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Extension of Time AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND ALL DEADLINES UNTIL AFTER THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION RULES ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER by Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Burkhalter, Carl) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dow Chemical Company. filed by Dow Chemical Company (Burkhalter, Carl) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S Burkhalter on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Burkhalter, Carl) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Evan P Moltz on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Moltz, Evan) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finishing Solutions LLC. BASF Corporation served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; Bayer Corporation (green card signed but not dated)served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Covestro LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018; Dow Chemical Company served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; Huntsman Corporation served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018; Huntsman International LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018; Mitsui Chemicals America Inc served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018; Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (KAM) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finishing Solutions LLC. MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (KAM) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Covestro LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd. mailed certified mail (KAM) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Request for service by certified mail filed by Finishing Solutions LLC. (Hellums, Christopher) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Covestro LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, MCNS, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, Mitsui Chemicals Inc, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd, Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd, filed by Finishing Solutions LLC.(KAM) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3162663. related document 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Covestro LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, MCNS, MCNS Polyurethanes USA Inc, Mitsui Chemicals America Inc, Mitsui Chemicals Inc, Wanhua Chamical America Co Ltd, Wanhua Chemical Group Co Ltd, filed by Finishing Solutions LLC.(KAM). (Hellums, Christopher) NDAL rec# B4601091608
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 22 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?