Habib v. Bank of America Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-04079-TWT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 5:05 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER adopting 20 Final Report and Recommendation dismissing this action. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/28/11. (dr)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that defendant's 17 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint be GRANTED and plaintiff's amended complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (With Order for Service). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/29/2011. (rej)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER adopting 10 Report and Recommendations, granting 3 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. The Plaintiff has 14 days to file an amended complaint; if he does not, the dismissal is with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/29/11. (dr)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending 3 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED, and plaintiffs complaint, [Doc. 1], be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and that plaintiff be granted fourteen (14) days to file an amended complaint that complies with Rules 8, 9, and 10 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), each party may file written objections, if any, to the Report and Recommendation within fourteen (14) days of the receipt of this Order. The Clerk is directed to submit the Report and Recommendation with objections, if any, to the district court after expiration of the above time period Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/15/11. (Attachments: # 1 Order for Service)(hfm)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?