United States v. 802 North Main Street, Yuma, Colorado
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02296-LTB-MEH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 6:47 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE: The United States shall have full and legal title to defendant 802 North Main Street, Yuma, Colorado, shall enter in favor of the United States. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Judgment. A Certificate of Reasonable Cause pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2465, which this Order constitutes, is granted as to defendant 802 North Main Street, Yuma, Colorado. Signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/16/2008.(sah, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER of Interlocutory Sale re: Unopposed 59 Motion for Order of Interlocutory Sale as to Defendant 802 North Main Street, Yuma, Colorado. The U.S., through the Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency, shall take possession of the property, property shall be sold, and proceeds shall be deposited with the Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency. (See Order for further explanation). Signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/11/07.(mrs, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice, the United States' 48 Motion to Compel Discovery for failure to comply with D.C. LCivR 37.1., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/30/07.(mrs, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed 51 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order regarding the current deposition dates of the Witness in this matter. Parties shall promptly notify the Court if any settlement is reached before that time, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/11/07.(mrs, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Claimant's 21 Motion to Suppress Fruits of Search. Signed by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/12/07.(mrs, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock : Oral Argument Hearing held on 6/8/2007. Claimant's 21 Motion to Suppress Fruits of Search is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel.) (mrs, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Status/Scheduling Conf set for 5/2/07 and resetting it to 5/15/07 at 3:30 p.m., by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/16/07.(erv, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?