Roussell v. PBF Consultants, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00899

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2020 at 3:21 PM DT (8.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeprece Roussell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antonio M. Clayton +1 225 344 7000 +1 225 383 7631 tclaytonlaw@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J Ward, III +1 225 344 7000 +1 225 383 7631 rickward3rd@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clayton and Fruge

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Fruge' +1 225 344 7000 +1 225 383 7631 michaelfruge@claytonfrugelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Roland Thomas Christensen +1 713 222 3800 jennifer-arispe-1561@ecf.pacerpro.com
v.
No Logo Chalmette Refining, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tynan Buthod +1 713 229 1912 +1 713 229 2712 ty.buthod@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin +1 713 229 1510 +1 713 229 7810 ben.gonsoulin@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori D. Barker +1 504 702 1719 lori.Barker@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Clean Harbors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori D. Barker +1 504 702 1719 lori.Barker@wilsonelser.com
No Logo John Sprafka, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tynan Buthod +1 713 229 1912 +1 713 229 2712 ty.buthod@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin +1 713 229 1510 +1 713 229 7810 ben.gonsoulin@bakerbotts.com
No Logo PBF Consultants, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Breithaupt, Dunn, DuBos, Shafto & Wolleson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kermit Lamar Walters, III +1 318 322 1202 +1 318 322 1984 lwalters@bddswlaw.com
No Logo PBF Holding Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tynan Buthod +1 713 229 1912 +1 713 229 2712 ty.buthod@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin +1 713 229 1510 +1 713 229 7810 ben.gonsoulin@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Pbf Investments, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Breithaupt, Dunn, DuBos, Shafto & Wolleson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kermit Lamar Walters, III +1 318 322 1202 +1 318 322 1984 lwalters@bddswlaw.com
No Logo PBFX Operating Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tynan Buthod +1 713 229 1912 +1 713 229 2712 ty.buthod@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin +1 713 229 1510 +1 713 229 7810 ben.gonsoulin@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Wayne Lacomb, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tynan Buthod +1 713 229 1912 +1 713 229 2712 ty.buthod@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin +1 713 229 1510 +1 713 229 7810 ben.gonsoulin@bakerbotts.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Response
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Continue
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Continue
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Amend
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Amended Notice of Removal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Amend
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending 12 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to CANCEL the Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2018. No status report is due at this time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Remand*
                                                                        MOTION to Remand by Jeprece Roussell. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction)(Christensen, Roland)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE AND ORDER: The 8 Motion to Substitute is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to substitute the revised Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 8-1, pp. 1-13) in the place of R. Doc. 1. In light of the removing defendants' position that complete diversity exists when the citizenship of the non-diverse defendants (PBF Consultants, LLC, PBF Investments, LLC, John Sprafka, and Wayne Lacomb) is not considered, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file either: (1) a Motion to Remand addressing the joinder of the non-diverse defendants or (2) an Amended Complaint deleting all claims against the non-diverse defendants within twenty-one (21) days of this Notice and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PBF Consultants, LLC, PBF Investments, LLC.(Walters, Kermit) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Supplemental Consent to Removal by PBF Consultants, LLC, PBF Investments, LLC. (Walters, Kermit) Modified on 10/30/2018 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
                                                                                MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Chalmette Refining, LLC, Wayne Lacomb, PBF Holding Company, LLC, PBFX Operating Company, LLC, John Sprafka. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, # 2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE AND ORDER: PBF Defendants shall file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of the named parties. The PBF Defendants shall have seven days to file the Motion to Substitute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/22/2018. (NLT)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Letter to Attorney K. Lamar Walters, III regarding R. Alan Breithaupt who is Co-Counsel for party PBF Consultants, LLC and PBF Investments, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Consent to Removal by PBF Consultants, LLC, PBF Investments, LLC. (Walters, Kermit) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/13/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/17/2018. (NLT)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Consent to Removal by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Clean Harbors, Inc.. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Chalmette Refining, LLC, Wayne Lacomb, PBF Holding Company, LLC, PBFX Operating Company, LLC, John Sprafka (Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-672352. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1844698), filed by PBF Holding Company, LLC, Wayne Lacomb, John Sprafka, Chalmette Refining, LLC, PBFX Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(Buthod, Charles) Modified on 10/31/2018 to replace docs as per Order #11 (LLH).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION(S) REFERRED: 12 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2018. Motions shall be filed by 11/20/2018. (LLH)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?