David Alton Brumbaugh and Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Washington Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-01182
District Judge Samuel J. Steiner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 11:30 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elizabeth Lange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shafer & Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , James W Shafer +1 206 682 4802
No Logo Lang Family Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shafer & Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , James W Shafer +1 206 682 4802
No Logo Scott Lange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shafer & Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , James W Shafer +1 206 682 4802
v.
No Logo Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Market Place Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kyle D Netterfield +1 206 682 0565 +1 206 625 1052 knetterfield@elmlaw.com
No Logo David Alton Brumbaugh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Market Place Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kyle D Netterfield +1 206 682 0565 +1 206 625 1052 knetterfield@elmlaw.com
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Kyle D. Netterfield Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh. (Netterfield, Kyle) (Entered: 09/29/2004 at 16:12:09)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER Approving Dismissal Signed on 4/26/2004 . (Scott, Tonya) (Entered: 04/27/2004 at 15:11:38)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BNC Certificate of Service Service Date 04/25/2004. (Related Doc # 44) (Admin.) (Entered: 04/25/2004 at 22:08:40)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER Regarding Determination Of Non-Dischargeable Debt Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 523 (a) and Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Signed on 4/22/2004 (related document(s)35 . Case Can Close: 5/7/2004. (Redmond, Danny) (Entered: 04/23/2004 at 11:32:26)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Received UNSIGNED Order. Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange. (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/21/2004 at 16:40:19)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Declaration of No Opposition (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/21/2004 at 16:30:25)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Response to Motion to Determine Debt Nondischargeable (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Scott, Tonya) (Entered: 04/20/2004 at 14:38:42)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Letter From Judge To: James Shafer advising the trial date of 04/26/04 is stricken. (related document(s)1). (Brooks, Janice) (Entered: 04/05/2004 at 15:53:47)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Plaintiff's Declaration of Mailing Re: Motion to Determine Debt Non-dischargeable (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Scott Lange. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/05/2004 at 11:30:24)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Determine Debt Non-dischargeable (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Scott Lange. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/02/2004 at 13:36:39)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Motion to Determine Debt Nondischargeable (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Scott Lange. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/02/2004 at 13:34:36)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing RE: Motion to Determine Debt Nondischargeable (related document(s)35 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Scott Lange. Scheduled for 4/23/2004 at 09:30 AM at Judge Steiner Courtroom, Room 407, Park Place Building. Response due by 4/19/2004. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/02/2004 at 13:28:00)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Plaintiff's Motion to Determine Debt Nondischargeable Pursuant to 11usc 523(a). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Scott Lange. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Shafer, James) (Entered: 04/02/2004 at 13:24:24)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Letter From Attorney Jim Shafer to Judge: Steiner RE Settlement Agreement . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 03/31/2004 at 11:21:49)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Stipulated Order Setting Trial Date Signed on 12/8/2003 . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 12/11/2003 at 16:51:48)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Order Signed on 11/21/2003 (related document(s)24 Motion). (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/24/2003 at 14:29:28)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Agreed Received UNSIGNED Order. Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Scott Lange. (related document(s)18 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). (Shafer, James) (Entered: 11/20/2003 at 15:42:29)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Transcript of 11/7/03 Ruling of Judge Samuel J. Steiner . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/19/2003 at 15:37:47)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Defendant's Response to Motion to Compel (related document(s)18 ). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/05/2003 at 14:57:14)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Plaintiff's Reply to Motion For Protective Order (related document(s)24 Motion). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 11/05/2003 at 12:15:26)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Proof of Service Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (related document(s)25 Hearing Notice,, 26 Declaration,, 24 Motion). (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:57:30)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certification and Declaration of Kyle D. Netterfield in Support of Motion for Protective Order (related document(s)24 ). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 6-72 Exhibit 83 Exhibit 9) (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:54:46)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Notice of Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (related document(s)24 ). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . Scheduled for 11/7/2003 at 09:30 AM at Judge Steiner Courtroom, Room 407, Park Place Building. (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:42:37)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Defendant's Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Honda, Marsha) Modified on 11/4/2003 (Honda, Marsha). (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:40:36)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Agreed Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Signed on 10/31/2003 (related document(s)18 ). Scheduled for 11/7/2003 at 09:30 AM at Judge Steiner Courtroom, Room 407, Park Place Building. (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:38:38)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Declaration of James W. Shafer in Support of Motion to Compel (related document(s)18 ). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:35:27)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Declaration of Randy Boyer in Support of Motion to Compel (related document(s)18 ). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:31:53)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Declaration of Scott Lange in Support of Motion to Compel (related document(s)18 ). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:30:09)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to FRCP 37(a) (related document(s)18 ). Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:28:10)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Motion to Compel Discovery (FRCP 37(a)) . Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2003 at 15:26:07)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Received UNSIGNED Order. Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature Joint Order Shorten Time Filed by Kyle D Netterfield, James W Shafer on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh, Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange. (related document(s)16 Motion in an Adversary Case generic). (Shafer, James) (Entered: 10/31/2003 at 12:19:47)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Joint Motion Shorten Time. Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange. (Shafer, James) (Entered: 10/31/2003 at 12:12:56)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  First Amended Answer Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Hardy, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/30/2003 at 12:55:40)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Proof of Service Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (related document(s)12 Declaration,, 9 Motion for Summary Judgment, 10 Hearing Notice,, 11 Declaration). (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2003 at 14:34:14)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Declaration of Kyle Nettfield (related document(s)9 ). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 2-32 Exhibit 4-93 Exhibit 10-144 Exhibit 15-175 Exhibit 18-206 Exhibit 21) (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2003 at 14:28:47)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Declaration of Connie Brumbaugh (related document(s)9 ). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Attachments: 1 Continuation Pt22 Continuation Pt 33 Continuation Pt 4) (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2003 at 14:06:32)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Declaration of David Brumbaugh (related document(s)9 ). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2003 at 13:59:42)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of Hearing on (related document(s)9 Motion for Summary Judgment). Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . Scheduled for 11/14/2003 at 09:30 AM at Judge Steiner Courtroom, Room 407, Park Place Building. (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2003 at 13:56:24)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2003 at 13:53:30)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Proof of Service to Parties Not Served Electronically (related document(s)7 Order GENERIC). (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 08/11/2003 at 10:45:50)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Conference Signed on 8/5/2003 . (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 08/11/2003 at 10:40:59)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Letter From Attorney Jim Schafer to Judge Steiner: Re Reschedule Pretrial Conference. (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 07/15/2003 at 12:03:59)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Answer to Complaint filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh. (Honda, Marsha) (Entered: 06/05/2003 at 15:30:32)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle D Netterfield on behalf of Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh, David Alton Brumbaugh. (Stewart, Marsha) (Entered: 06/04/2003 at 10:22:45)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Proof of Service filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Elizabeth Lange, Scott Lange . (related document(s)2, 1). (Stewart, Marsha) (Entered: 05/09/2003 at 09:42:50)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (with Certificate of Service) to be served on defendants: David Alton Brumbaugh and Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh; Answer Due 06/2/2003. Pretrial conference scheduled for 7/9/2003 at 09:00 AM, Everett Municipal Court (courtroom to be assigned), 3028 Wetmore Avenue, Everett, WA. (Brooks, Janice) (Entered: 05/02/2003 at 13:22:51)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Complaint against David Alton Brumbaugh 727 TO DENY DISCHARGE . Filed by James W Shafer on behalf of Lang Family Trust, Scott Lange, Connie Lorraine Brumbaugh. (Atkins, Sharon) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2003 (Breen, Ardell). Modified on 5/12/2003 (Stevenson, Nigel). MODIFIED TO CHANGE TYPE OF COMPLAINT FROM A 426 TO 424 (Entered: 04/30/2003 at 12:52:55)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?