Kirk Nyberg v. Portfolio Recovery Associates
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 17-35315

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 5:03 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/03/2017. See order for details. [10530145] (LW) [Entered: 08/02/2017 10:26 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 08/02/2017. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [10454717] (LW) [Entered: 05/31/2017 03:31 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 05/31/2017, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 05/19/2017 ). [10407334] (LW) [Entered: 04/24/2017 08:43 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 05/19/2017, 09:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10403313] (LW) [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:02 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Appellee Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/18/2017. [10400017] [17-35315] (Topor, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/18/2017 10:00 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Kirk J. Nyberg Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/17/2017. [10399329] [17-35315] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 04/17/2017 04:39 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/18/2017. Transcript ordered by 05/10/2017. Transcript due 06/09/2017. Appellant Kirk J. Nyberg opening brief due 07/19/2017. Appellee Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answering brief due 08/18/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10391447] (JBS) [Entered: 04/11/2017 10:14 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?