State of Washington v. Trump
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01510
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2018 at 12:12 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo State of Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Erin Kristen McCarthy +1 850 414 3864 +1 850 410 0179 e_mccarthy@ymail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Marie Colleen Clarke +1 360 586 6300 +1 360 586 6655 MarieC@atg.wa.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com
, Shannon E Smith +1 206 389 3996 +1 206 587 5636 shannons@atg.wa.gov
, Jonathan Craig Thompson +1 360 586 6740 jonat@atg.wa.gov
Space Fronda Colleen Woods +1 360 586 2644 +1 360 664 0174 frondaw@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alicia O Young +1 360 459 6100 AliciaO@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jerald Roger Anderson +1 360 753 2702 +1 360 664 0174 JerryA1@atg.wa.gov
Space Jeffrey T. Even +1 360 586 0728 +1 360 664 2963 jeff.even@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John A Level +1 360 586 6770 johnl3@atg.wa.gov
Space William R Sherman +1 206 442 4485 BillS5@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40110-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Toni Marie Hood +1 360 586 2644 +1 360 664 0174 ToniH@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40111-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chalia Stallings Ala'Ilima +1 206 326 5480 chalias@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY La Rond Baker +1 206 516 2999 larondb@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrea Brenneke +1 206 233 3384 +1 206 464 6451 AndreaB3@atg.wa.gov
Space Anne Elizabeth Egeler +1 360 753 7085 annee1@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchell Alan Riese +1 206 464 7744 mitchellr@atg.wa.gov
, , Sarah Shifley +1 206 389 3974 sarahs5@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Audrey L. Udashen +1 206 805 0989 audreyu@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Justin Wade +1 206 464 7030 justinw@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly T Wood +1 360 586 6766 +1 360 586 6760 kellyw1@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40126-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Gary E Andrews +1 360 586 6300 garya@atg.wa.gov
, Ian M Bauer +1 360 586 6300 IanB@atg.wa.gov
, Daniel J Judge +1 360 586 6300 +1 360 459 6967 danielj@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Mentzer +1 360 586 6300 EricM@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Carla Burke +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 cburkepickrel@baronbudd.com
, , Celeste A. Evangelisti +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 cevangelisti@baronbudd.com
, , Paul Scott Summy +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 ssummy@baronbudd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERM Anne M. Nardacci +1 518 434 0600 +1 518 434 0665 anardacci@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Liz Rumsey +1 510 879 0550 +1 510 622 2270 liz.rumsey@doj.ca.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE George Torgun +1 510 879 1002 +1 510 622 2270 George.Torgun@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrie L. Bashaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carrie L. Bashaw

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas D. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Douglas D. Walsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Evans & Dixon, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Aaron Michael Zigler +1 314 241 4844 +1 314 241 3525 azigler@koreintillery.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 06/06/2014, TERMINATED: 06/06/2014, TERMINATED: 06/06/2014, TERMINATED: 06/06/2014, TERMINATED: 06/06/2014, TERMINATED: 06/06/ Jennifer Milici +1 202 326 2912 jmilici@ftc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Gomez Trial Attorneys

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , John Paul Fiske +1 619 237 3490 +1 619 237 3496 fiske@gomeztrialattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Health Care Fraud Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Grossmann +1 360 586 3550 +1 360 586 3454 mikeg1@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by James M. Lockhart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERM James M. Lockhart

Toggle Switch Represented by James P. McCarthy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINATED: 09/10/2013, TERMINAT James P. McCarthy

Toggle Switch Represented by John Allen Yanchunis , Sr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTI John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERM Kelly Laudon +1 612 217 8921 klaudon@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph, Greenwald & Laake, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Veronica Byam Nannis +3 010 220 2200 +1 301 220 1214 vnannis@jgllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , John R. Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Leilani N. Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Leilani N. Fisher

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERMINATED: 09/12/2013, TERM Jessica Lynn Meyer +1 612 371 2409 +1 612 371 3207 jmeyer@lindquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCELDREW LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Joseph Mceldrew +1 215 545 8800 jim@mceldrewlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGARVEY HEBERLING SULLIVAN & McGARVEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Roger M. Sullivan +1 406 752 5566 +7527 752 752 7124 rsullivan@mcgarveylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGARVEY HEBERLING SULLIVAN & McGARVEY, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dustin A. Leftridge +1 406 752 5566

Toggle Switch Represented by Michelle M. Teed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michelle M. Teed

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James Dennis Young +1 904 361 0012 jyoung@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan D. Orent +1 401 457 7723 +1 401 457 7708 jorent@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Yueh-ru Chu +1 212 416 6588 +1 212 416 6007 Yueh-ru.Chu@ag.ny.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Andrew G. Frank +1 212 416 8271 +1 212 416 6007 andrew.frank@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by North

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Brevard

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth G. Arthur +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 9134 Elizabeth.Arthur@myfloridalegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marsha J. Chien +1 206 464 7744 marshac@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/17/2015 Dorothy Harris Jaffe +1 360 586 3158 +1 360 586 4637 dorij@atg.wa.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Katherine Ann Kiziah +1 561 837 5007 +1 561 588 3705 Katherine.Kiziah@myfloridalegal.com
, Ronald L Lavigne +1 360 586 6751 +1 360 586 6760 ronaldl@atg.wa.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , R. Scott Palmer +1 850 414 3300 +1 650 488 9134 scott.palmer@myfloridalegal.com
, , El Shon Richmond +1 360 586 6300 +1 360 586 6655 elshonr@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nels Johnson +1 360 586 3514 +1 360 586 6760 ECYOLYEF@ATG.WA.GOV

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the District of Columbia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , CRAIG S. FARRINGER +1 202 442 9841
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan Phan +1 202 727 3225 +1 202 741 5908

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/08/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2 Jonathan Sclarsic +1 617 963 2045 jonathan.sclarsic@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New Mexico Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY William G. Grantham +1 505 222 9024 +1 505 222 9006 wgrantham@nmag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Gordon Abrams +1 212 417 4010 +1 212 417 5335 david.abrams@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Washington Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Dannette W Allen +1 509 625 5298 +1 509 458 3548 DannetA@atg.wa.gov
, , , , , Jarold Phillip Cartwright +1 509 456 2773 +1 509 458 3548 jerryc@atg.wa.gov
, Alan D Copsey +1 360 664 9018 AlanC@atg.wa.gov
Space Robert K Costello +1 360 586 2872
, , Steve Dietrich +1 360 956 7926
, Rebecca Ripoli Glasgow +1 360 586 6494 RebeccaG@atg.wa.gov
, , , Peter J Helmberger +1 253 593 5243 peterh@atg.wa.gov
, , Michael Jason Hemker +1 206 389 3880 +1 206 464 6338 michael.hemker@atg.wa.gov
Space Joseph V Panesko +1 360 586 3276 +1 360 586 0643 joep@atg.wa.gov
, , Sarah Parkman +1 360 586 8876
Space Benjamin J. Roesch +1 206 389 2105 benjaminr@atg.wa.gov
, Leslie R. Seffern +1 360 586 6770 +1 360 586 4613 leslies@atg.wa.gov
, , , Lisa LeAnn Sutton +1 360 586 6300 +1 360 586 6655 LisaS1@atg.wa.gov
, , , , , Holly Ann Vance +1 509 456 6190 +1 509 456 2486 hollyv@atg.wa.gov
Space Gregory K Ziser +1 360 534 4862 GregoryZ1@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 40116

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Paul Douglas Weisser +1 360 586 1445 +1 360 664 8716 paulw@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sarah Levien Shullman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Sarah Levien Shullman

Toggle Switch Represented by State Of Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Erica A. Koscher +1 206 326 5484 +1 206 464 6338 ericak@atg.wa.gov
Space State of Washington

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander +1 206 326 5488 CynthiaA@atg.wa.gov
Space Stephen T Fairchild +1 206 389 2848 stephenf2@atg.wa.gov
, Erica A. Koscher +1 206 326 5484 +1 206 464 6338 ericak@atg.wa.gov
Space Paula Lillian Selis +1 206 464 7662 +1587563 +15 587 5636 paulas@atg.wa.gov
Space James T. Sugarman +1 206 389 2514 JamesS6@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by TELLER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Gregory Arthur Hitzel +1 206 324 8969 +1 206 860 3172 greg@stellerlaw.com
, , , , , Stephen A Teller +1 206 324 8969 +8603 860 860 3172 steve@stellerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Capitol

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Philip Michael Bein +1 518 776 2413 +1 518 650 9363 philip.bein@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Fred Russell Disheroon +1 202 616 9649 +1 202 616 9667 fred.disheroon@usdoj.gov
, , , Michael J McNulty +1 202 514 1210 michael.mcnulty@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Van Ness Feldman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , TERMINATED: 02/21/2006, TERMINATED: 02/21/2006, TERMINATED: 02/21/2006, TERMINATED: 02/21/2006, TERMINATED: 02/21/2006, TERMINATED: 02/21/2006 Matthew Alan Love +1 206 829 1809 +1 206 623 4986 mal@vnf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WA STATE ATTY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert W. Ferguson +1 206 464 7744 +1 206 646 6451 chamenew@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A Fitz +1 360 459 6320 +1 360 586 6760 AndyF@atg.wa.gov
, , , , , Amanda Marie Migchelbrink +1 360 586 1445 +1 360 664 8716 amandam2@atg.wa.gov
, Katharine Goold Shirey +1 360 586 6769 +1 360 586 6760 kay.shirey@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Todd Sprung +1 206 326 5492 +1 206 623 0549 jeff.sprung@atg.wa.gov
v.
No Logo Don Wright, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bradley P. Humphreys +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.p.humphreys@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas G. Rollins +1 248 539 7423 +1 248 932 6350 thomasgrollins@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Bell Mcandrews & Hiltachk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Charles Herbert Bell, Jr. +1 916 442 7757 +1 916 442 7759 cbell@bmhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Belongia Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Shelley Smith +1 312 475 9900 ssmith@bupdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Callahan & Blaine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael S. Leboff +1 714 241 4444 +1 714 241 4445 mleboff@callahan-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Andrea Shwayri +1 561 650 7900 +1 561 655 6222 shwayria@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodel Wilks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Matthew Allen Hodel +1 949 450 4420 +1 949 450 4479 mhodel@hodelwilks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steven A. Marenberg +1 310 203 7547 +1 310 203 7199 smarenberg@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jassy Vick Carolan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jean-Paul Jassy +1 310 870 7048 +1 310 870 7010 jpjassy@jassyvick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael T. Brody +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 527 0484 mbrody@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kendall Brill & Klieger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Philip M Kelly +1 310 556 2700 +1 310 556 2705 pkelly@kbkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan P Steinsapir +1 310 566 9800 +1 310 566 9850 jsteinsapir@kwikalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Steven R. Whitman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Steven R. Whitman +1 617 227 8118 +1 617 523 1345 swhitman@whitmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Makarem and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marni Beth Folinsky +1 310 312 0299 folinsky@law-rm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Museum Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert John Borrello +1 305 373 2101 +1 305 373 2103 rborrello@russomanno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Angie L Henson - DOJ +1 214 659 8600 +1 214 659 8807 angie.henson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.o. Box 868

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Timothy Michael Belsan +1 202 532 4596 +1 202 305 7000 timothy.m.belsan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Derek C Julius +1 202 532 4323 +1 202 305 4117 derek.julius2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Edward S. White +1 202 616 9131 +1 202 305 7000 edward.s.white@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , Stacey Ilene Young +1 202 305 7171 stacey.young@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Parcher & Hayes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Hayes +1 212 382 0200 +1 212 382 0200

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 878

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jeffrey L Menkin +1 202 353 3920 +1 202 616 2491 Jeff.Menkin2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lindsay M. Murphy +1 202 616 4018 Lindsay.M.Murphy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Tom J. Ferber +1 212 326 0194 +1 212 326 0806 tferber@pryorcashman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russomanno & Borrello, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Herman Joseph Russomanno, III +1 305 373 2101 +3732 373 373 2103 herman2@russomanno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russomano & Borello PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Herman Joseph Russomanno, III +1 305 373 2101 +3732 373 373 2103 herman2@russomanno.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sellars Marion & Bachi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Daniel M. Bachi +1 561 655 8111 +1 561 655 4994 dbachi@smb-law.com
, , , John Baptist Paul Marion, IV. +1 561 655 8111 +6554 655 655 4994 jmarion@smb-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sellars, Marion & Bachi, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Daniel M. Bachi +1 561 655 8111 +1 561 655 4994 dbachi@smb-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 dennis.barghaan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph C Dugan +1 202 514 3259 joseph.dugan@usdoj.gov
, , , Ari Nazarov +1 202 514 4120 ari.nazarov@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Western District Of Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Brian C Kipnis +1 206 553 7970 Brian.Kipnis@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Andrew C Brinkman +1 202 305 7035 andrew.brinkman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Joseph Francis Carilli, Jr. +1 202 616 4848 +1 202 305 7000 joseph.f.carilli2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , August Edward Flentje +1 202 514 1278 august.flentje@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lyle D. Jentzer +1 202 305 0192 +1 202 305 0192 lyle.jentzer@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Ethan B Kanter +1 202 616 9123 ethan.kanter@usdoj.gov
, , , James C. Luh +1 202 514 4938 james.luh@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Aaron R Petty +1 202 532 4542 +1 202 305 7000 aaron.r.petty@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Chad A. Readler +1 202 514 7830 chad.a.readler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Brian Christopher Ward +1 202 616 9121 brian.c.ward@usdoj.gov
No Logo Eric Hargan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
No Logo R. Alexander Acosta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Solicitor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Karen M. Barefield +1 202 693 9370 +1 202 693 9392 barefield.karen@dol.gov
, Oscar L. Hampton, III +1 215 861 5122 +1 215 861 5162
, Jeffrey S. Rogoff +1 646 264 3673 +1 646 264 3660 rogoff.jeffrey@dol.gov
Space Matt S. Shepherd +1 615 781 5330 +1 615 781 5321 shepherd.matt@dol.gov
, Amy Tai +1 646 602 5600 +1 646 533 4598 tai.amy@dol.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Leslie K. Herje +1 608 264 5158 leslie.herje@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/22/2018 Stephen M. Horn +1 304 345 2200 +1 304 347 5443 Steve.Horn@usdoj.gov
Space Michael H. Hoses +1 505 346 7274 michael.hoses@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C. Lindsay +1 304 345 2200 +1 304 347 5443 Matthew.Lindsay@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney (Grand Rapids)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan D. Cobb +1 616 456 2404 Ryan.Cobb@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , Peter A. Caplan +1 313 226 9100 +1 313 226 9784 peter.caplan@usdoj.gov
, Barbara L Oswald +1 608 264 5158 +1 608 264 5724 barbara.oswald@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bradley P. Humphreys +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.p.humphreys@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Avni Jayprakash Amin +1 617 565 9033 +1 202 693 9392 Amin.Avni.J@dol.gov
, Andrea J. Appel +1 215 861 5125 +1 215 861 5162 appel.andrea@dol.gov
, Bertha M. Astorga +1 215 861 5126 astorga.bertha.m@dol.gov
, Ali Abed Beydoun +1 202 693 9382 Beydoun.Ali@dol.gov
, Molly Knopp Biklen +1 646 264 3676 +1 646 264 3660 biklen.molly@dol.gov
, Karen E. Bobela +1 303 844 0963 bobela.karen.e@dol.gov
Space Susan Brinkerhoff +1 206 757 6754 +1 206 747 6761 brinkerhoff.susan@dol.gov
, Bruce Lee Brown +1 206 553 0940 +1 206 553 2768 brown.bruce.l@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/04/2018 JESSICA RUSZKIEWICZ BROWN +1 215 861 5144 brown.jessica.r@dol.gov
, , , , , JESSICA RUSZKIEWICZ BROWN +1 215 861 5144 brown.jessica.r@dol.gov
, , , , , Martin D. Cristopher Santos +1 213 894 0201 +1 213 894 2064 santos.martin.c@dol.gov
, Abigail Gonzales Daquiz +1 206 553 0940 daquiz.abigail@dol.gov
, , , , , Abigail Gonzales Daquiz +1 206 553 0940 daquiz.abigail@dol.gov
, Rose Darling +1 415 625 7744 +1 415 625 7772 darling.rose@dol.gov
, , , , Niamh E Doherty +1 213 894 3990 doherty.niamh@dol.gov
Space Ian H. Eliasoph +1 415 625 7746 +1 415 625 7772 Eliasoph.Ian@dol.gov
, Willow Eden Fort fort.willow@dol.gov
, , Nicholas C. Geale +1 816 285 7260 +1 816 285 7287
Space Elena S. Goldstein +1 646 264 3686 +1 646 264 3660 goldstein.elena@dol.gov
, Jeannie Gorman +20655 309 40x8051 +1 206 553 2768 gorman.jeannie@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dana M. Hague +1 816 285 7260 +1 816 285 7287 hague.dana.m@dol.gov
, , Dana M. Hague +1 816 285 7260 +1 816 285 7287 hague.dana.m@dol.gov
Space Marla J. Haley +1 312 353 5709 +1 312 353 5698 haley.marla@dol.gov
Space Michael Ross Hartman +1 202 693 5803 +1 202 693 5610 hartman.michael@dol.gov
Space Daniel M Hennefeld +1 646 264 3688 +1 646 264 3660 hennefeld.daniel@dol.gov
, , Christine Zuehlke Heri +1 312 353 5709 +1 312 353 5747 heri.christine@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JODEEN M. HOBBS +1 215 861 5143 Hobbs.jodeen@dol.gov
, Merle D. Hyman +1 617 565 2500
, , H. Alice Jacks +1 816 285 7260 +1 816 285 7287
, Carlton C Jackson +1 972 850 3100 +1 972 850 3103 jackson.carlton@dol.gov
Space Katherine Mace Kasameyer +1 415 625 7742 +1 415 625 7772 kasameyer.katherine@dol.gov
, Brian P Krier +1 215 861 5141 krier.brian@dol.gov
, Judith Marblestone +1 646 264 3650 +1 646 264 3660 marblestone.judith@dol.gov
, Scott Miller +1 617 565 2500 +1 617 565 2142 miller.scott.m@dol.gov
, Celeste C. Moran +1 617 565 2500 moran.celeste@dol.gov
Space Kristin Murphy +1 678 237 0613 murphy.kristin.r@dol.gov
, Natalie A Nardecchia +1 213 894 3284 +1 213 894 2064 Nardecchia.Natalie@dol.gov
, John A. Nocito +1 215 861 5135 nocito.john@dol.gov
, Laura M. O'Reilly +1 816 285 7277 +1 816 285 7287 o'reilly.laura.m@dol.gov
, Mark A. Pedulla +1 617 565 2500 +1 617 565 2142 pedulla.mark.a@dol.gov
Space Emily O. Roberts roberts.emily.o@dol.gov
Space Jeffrey S. Rogoff +1 646 264 3673 +1 646 264 3660 rogoff.jeffrey@dol.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine L. Seidelman +1 312 353 4995 +1 312 353 5698 seidelman.catherine@dol.gov
Space Catherine L. Seidelman +1 312 353 4995 +1 312 353 5698 seidelman.catherine@dol.gov
, , Margaret A Sewell +1 312 353 3481 +1 312 353 5698 sewell.margaret@dol.gov
, ORLY SHOHAM +1 646 264 3656 shoham.orly@dol.gov
Space Charles C. Song +1 213 894 5365 +1 213 894 2064 song.charles.c@dol.gov
, Charles C. Song +1 213 894 5365 +1 213 894 2064 song.charles.c@dol.gov
, , Nancy E Steffan +1 213 894 5366 +1 213 894 2064 Steffan.Nancy.E@dol.gov
, Melanie Stratton +1 404 302 5435 +1 404 302 5438 stratton.melanie.a@dol.gov
, , , Mia F. Terrell +1 972 850 3125 +1 972 850 3101 terrell.mia@dol.gov
, Sheryl L Vieyra +1 972 850 3123 vieyra.sheryl@dol.gov
Mnuchin, Steven Mnuchin, Steven, Defendant
Officially listed as "Steven T Mnuchin"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Health and Human Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Treasury"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
, , , , TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018, TERMINATED: 01/19/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
No Logo Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Alliance Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Michael Jeffrey Norton +1 303 759 5937 +1 303 759 9726 mnorton@tnslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alexander Patterson +1 206 462 6700 +1 206 462 6701 map@pattersonbuchanan.com
No Logo Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alexander Patterson +1 206 462 6700 +1 206 462 6701 map@pattersonbuchanan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Eric N. Kniffin +1 719 386 3000 ekniffin@lrrc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE L Martin Nussbaum +1 719 386 3000 +1 719 386 3070 mnussbaum@LRRC.com
No Logo Continuant, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alexander Patterson +1 206 462 6700 +1 206 462 6701 map@pattersonbuchanan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Eric N. Kniffin +1 719 386 3000 ekniffin@lrrc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE L Martin Nussbaum +1 719 386 3000 +1 719 386 3070 mnussbaum@LRRC.com
No Logo Electric Mirror, LLC, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alexander Patterson +1 206 462 6700 +1 206 462 6701 map@pattersonbuchanan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Eric N. Kniffin +1 719 386 3000 ekniffin@lrrc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE L Martin Nussbaum +1 719 386 3000 +1 719 386 3070 mnussbaum@LRRC.com
No Logo Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE L Martin Nussbaum +1 719 386 3000 +1 719 386 3070 mnussbaum@LRRC.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alexander Patterson +1 206 462 6700 +1 206 462 6701 map@pattersonbuchanan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Eric N. Kniffin +1 719 386 3000 ekniffin@lrrc.com
No Logo JE Dunn Construction Company, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alexander Patterson +1 206 462 6700 +1 206 462 6701 map@pattersonbuchanan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Eric N. Kniffin +1 719 386 3000 ekniffin@lrrc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE L Martin Nussbaum +1 719 386 3000 +1 719 386 3070 mnussbaum@LRRC.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Elizabeth L Kade for Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Eric Hargan, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael J Gerardi on behalf of Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Eric Hargan, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay; Case stayed. Motions terminated: 39 MOTION to Stay and 49 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Declaration
        DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Sprung filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 39 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
          REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 39 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Eric Hargan, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/26/2018, (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion
              NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment ; by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Eric Hargan, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 46 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Eric Hargan, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/3/2018, (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) R. Alexander Acosta, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Eric Hargan, filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                      RESPONSE, by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright, to 39 MOTION to Stay . (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Minute OrderCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's withdrawal of its subpoenas duces tecum, the Motion to Quash at Dkt 19 and the Motion for Protective Order at Dkt 13 are DENIED AS MOOT. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue the Deadline for Responding to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                            REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 27 MOTION to Continue Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Revised)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                              DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Sprung filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 39 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Motion To Stay
                                MOTION to Stay, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/5/2018, (Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                  REPLY, filed by Interested Party Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc., TO RESPONSE to 19 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum Served by Plaintiff or for Protective Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, pp. 1-3)(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Response to motion
                                    RESPONSE, by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright, to 27 MOTION to Continue Deadline. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                      DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Sprung filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 19 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum Served by Plaintiff or for Protective Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Response to motion
                                        RESPONSE, by Plaintiff State of Washington, to 19 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum Served by Plaintiff or for Protective Orders. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion
                                          NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re 29 Joint MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Orders ; by Interested Parties Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., J.E. Dunn Construction Company. (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                            NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support of Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Young, Alicia) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                              REPLY, filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright, TO RESPONSE to 13 MOTION for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                ORDER on the 26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court ADMITS Attorney L Martin Nussbaum for Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., and J.E. Dunn Construction Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  ORDER on the 25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric N Kniffin for Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., and J.E. Dunn Construction Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None motion to quash
                                                    Joint MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Orders, filed by Movants Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., J.E. Dunn Construction Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/22/2017, (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                                      DECLARATION of Alicia O. Young filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 27 MOTION to Continue Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Young, Alicia) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Motion to Continue
                                                        MOTION to Continue Deadline, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/22/2017, (Young, Alicia) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY L. Martin Nussbaum FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Movants Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., J.E. Dunn Construction Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5128368 (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erik N. Kniffin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Movants Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., J.E. Dunn Construction Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5128354 (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Alexander Patterson on behalf of Movants Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., Conestoga Wood Specialties Corporation, Continuant, Inc., Electric Mirror LLC, J.E. Dunn Construction Company. (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Praecipe to Attach Document
                                                                PRAECIPE to attach document Proposed Order re 21 Response to Motion by Plaintiff State of Washington (Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                  DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Sprung filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 13 MOTION for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiff State of Washington, to 13 MOTION for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery. (Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      ORDER on the 17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Norton for Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None motion to quash
                                                                        MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum Served by Plaintiff or for Protective Orders, filed by Movant Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A pp 1-15, # 2 Exhibit B pp 1-10, # 3 Exhibit C pp 1-3, # 4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/22/2017, (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Administrative Record
                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (ECF 14, DVD format (9 discs); 1 expando) RECEIVED; filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. The record is available in DVD format at the Clerk's Office (SP) Modified on 12/12/2017 (SP). (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Norton FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Movant Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5125780 (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Alexander Patterson on behalf of Movant Cherry Creek Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/5/2018, (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials
                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record (DVD Format) in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Motion for protective order
                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order and to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cherry Creek, # 2 Exhibit B - CHI-Franciscan, # 3 Exhibit C - Conestoga Wood, # 4 Exhibit D - Continuant Inc, # 5 Exhibit E - Cummins Allison, # 6 Exhibit F - Electric Mirror, # 7 Exhibit G - Hobby Lobby, # 8 Exhibit H - JE Dunn, # 9 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/15/2017, (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for motion to dismiss or for summary judgment up to 45 pages; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/5/2017, (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                          DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff State of Washington (Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington (Young, Alicia) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Joint Status Report Order Form for District JudgesCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Discovery and Depositions OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth L Kade on behalf of Defendants R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Association
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Cynthia L Alexander on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Alexander, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington (Young, Alicia) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. All future pleadings in this case shall bear the cause number C17-1510-RBL Judge James L. Robart no longer assigned to case. Cc to RBL. by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (ELS) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                          Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) R. Alexander Acosta, Steven T Mnuchin, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Treasury, United States Department of Labor, Don Wright. (Attachments: # 1 Dept. of Human and Health Services, # 2 Summons-Dept. of Labor, # 3 Summons-Mnuchin, # 4 Summons-Dept. of Treasury, # 5 Summons-Trump, # 6 Summons-Wright)(RE) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5045630) Attorney Jeffrey Todd Sprung added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Acosta, # 7 Summons Health/Human, # 8 Summons Labor, # 9 Summons Mnuchin, # 10 Summons Treasury, # 11 Summons Trump, # 12 Summons Wright)(Sprung, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?