Davis v. Aramark Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-08154-JAT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 10:28 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Remand to State Court; this case is remanded to Coconino County Superior Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for September 20, 2017, is vacated. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/12/17. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Remand Letter) (LAD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, the Court has reviewed the supplement to the notice of removal (Doc. 14 ) and finds jurisdiction to have been alleged. Thus, the Court will take no further action regarding jurisdiction, without prejudice to Plaintiffs raising any jurisdictional issues they deem appropriate. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/28/17. (MAW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that by August 29, 2017, Defendants shall file a supplement to the notice of removal properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction or this case will be remanded to state court. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/25/17. (MAW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 3 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?