Obduskey v. Wells Fargo
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 16-1330

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 12:08 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10010014490 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
[10570491] Supreme court order dated granting certiorari. [16-1330] [Entered: 06/28/2018 01:47 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10010001313 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    [10563705] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting attorney Jessica E. Yates' motion to withdraw as counsel for the appellees. The appellees will continue to be represented by Andrew M. Jacobs. Served on 06/01/2018. [16-1330] [Entered: 06/01/2018 04:06 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10010001283 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      [10563691] Motion filed by Appellees Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage for attorney Jessica E. Yates to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 06/01/2018. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1330] JEY [Entered: 06/01/2018 03:24 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10010000794 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        [10563432] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew Martin Jacobs for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo & Co. and Wells Fargo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/01/2018. Manner of Service: email. [16-1330] [Entered: 06/01/2018 07:15 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009960272 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          [10543625] Petition for writ of certiorari filed by Dennis Obduskey on 01/13/2018. Supreme Court Number 17-1307. [16-1330] [Entered: 03/16/2018 01:59 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009943103 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            [10535110] Mandate issued. [16-1330] [Entered: 02/12/2018 07:13 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009932887 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              [10529615] Judgment for opinion filed. [16-1330] [Entered: 01/19/2018 10:34 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009932879 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                [10529611] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Moritz, Kelly (author), and Murphy. Mandate to issue. [16-1330] [Entered: 01/19/2018 10:30 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009915944 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  [10521153] Response filed by Dennis Obduskey to Response to Supplemental Authority Filed By Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Served on 12/14/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1330] SLH [Entered: 12/14/2017 08:48 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009912711 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    [10519465] Supplemental authority filed by Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Served on 12/06/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1330] JEY [Entered: 12/06/2017 05:34 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009912664 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      [10519435] Supplemental authority filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Served on 12/06/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1330] JEY [Entered: 12/06/2017 04:09 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009901397 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        [10513586] Case argued by Steven Hill for the Appellant; Jessica Yates and Holly Shilliday for the Apellees; and submitted to Judges Kelly, Murphy and Moritz. [16-1330] [Entered: 11/14/2017 02:35 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009893735 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          [10509841] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on the joint unopposed motion for additional oral argument time filed by the Appellees’. At the direction of the panel assigned to this appeal, the motion is denied. Served on 10/31/2017. [16-1330] [Entered: 10/31/2017 11:20 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009892404 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            [10509209] Motion filed by Appellees Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, McCarthy & Holthus LLP to enlarge time for oral argument. Served on: 10/27/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1330] JEY [Entered: 10/27/2017 03:41 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009890776 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              [10508423] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by McCarthy & Holthus, LLP. Served on 10/25/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1330] HRS [Entered: 10/25/2017 10:25 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009878257 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                [10501806] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Served on 09/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1330] JEY [Entered: 09/28/2017 10:26 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?