J.R. v. Lakeport Unified School District
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-06211

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 11, 2020 at 6:39 PM DT (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Received Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Received Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Brief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 37 MOTION TO DISMISS. By Judge Alsup.(whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT LAKEPORT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO STAY; STAYING KELSEYVILLE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Stay]. This order sua sponte STAYS plaintiff O.G.'s state law claims against Kelseyville Unified School District. Status Report due by 6/21/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART KELSEYVILLE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss]. Motion for leave to amend complaint due by 1/14/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Document (Not Motion)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING [re 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the California Supreme Court's Decision in Big Oak; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Lakeport Unified School District]. BY NOON on 12/17/2018, defendant KELSEYVILLE UNITIFED SCHOOL DISTRICT MUST RESPOND. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/12/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/8/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Document Sealed - NEF
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/20/2018. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 27 AND 28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) Modified on 11/7/2018 (whalc3, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?