Gentry v. Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04214

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2019 at 5:12 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Gentry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Accurso Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Louis Carl Accurso +1 816 561 3900 +1 816 561 2992 laccurso@accursolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Burton S. Haigh +1 816 561 3900 +1 816 561 2992 bhaigh@accursolaw.com
No Logo Leann Gentry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Accurso Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Louis Carl Accurso +1 816 561 3900 +1 816 561 2992 laccurso@accursolaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Burton S. Haigh +1 816 561 3900 +1 816 561 2992 bhaigh@accursolaw.com
v.
No Logo Four B Corp., Defendant
No Logo Hen House Marketplace, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Karl Kuckelman +1 913 888 1000 +1 913 888 1065 kk@wsabe.com
No Logo John Does 1-4, Defendant
No Logo Prinston Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin F. Hormuth +1 314 241 9090 +1 314 345 5467 kfh@greensfelder.com
No Logo Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin F. Hormuth +1 314 241 9090 +1 314 345 5467 kfh@greensfelder.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP - KC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Ray Price, Jr. +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 621 2328 wprice@armstrongteasdale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Duff Turner +1 573 636 8394 +1 573 636 8457 mturner@armstrongteasdale.com
No Logo The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Allen Sasse +1 949 263 8400 +1 949 263 8414 dsasse@crowell.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Reassign/Transfer Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of filing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Answer
                                    Defendant Hen House Marketplace LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on behalf of Hen House Marketplace, LLC.(Kuckelman, Karl)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages) on behalf of Hen House Marketplace, LLC.(Kuckelman, Karl)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Defendant Hen House Marketplace LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages) on behalf of Hen House Marketplace, LLC.(Kuckelman, Karl) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Jury Demand
                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hen House Marketplace, LLC. (Kuckelman, Karl)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 DESIGNATION
                                            DESIGNATION of Lead Counsel by Hen House Marketplace, LLC. (Kuckelman, Karl)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of appearance by Karl Kuckelman on behalf of Hen House Marketplace, LLC (Attorney Karl Kuckelman added to party Hen House Marketplace, LLC(pty:dft))(Kuckelman, Karl)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS (pursuant to Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1) filed by Daniel Sasse on behalf of Defendant The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C. d/b/a Major Pharmaceuticals.(Sasse, Daniel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages) on behalf of The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C. d/b/a Major Pharmaceuticals.(Sasse, Daniel)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' motions for an extension of time, Doc. 7 and Doc. 10, are granted. Defendants Prinston Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. must file responses to Plaintiff's complaint on or before November 14, 2018. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jackson, Rachel) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Matthew Duff Turner on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Turner, Matthew)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                        First DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS as to Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1 filed by Kevin F. Hormuth on behalf of Defendant Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC.(Hormuth, Kevin)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                          First DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS as to Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1 filed by Kevin F. Hormuth on behalf of Defendant Prinston Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Hormuth, Kevin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 extension of time
                                                            Consent MOTION for extension of time To File a Responsive Pleading filed by Kevin F. Hormuth on behalf of Prinston Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hormuth, Kevin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Rule 16 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/2/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/26/2018. Signed on 10/12/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Notice of Pretrial ProcedureCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 10/12/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Notice of MAPN
                                                                  NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew Duff Turner on behalf of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Turner, Matthew)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Notice of filing
                                                                      NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiffs of Filing Notice of Removal by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Turner, Matthew)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 notice of removal
                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County, Missouri County, case number 18BA-CV03617, filed by Matthew Duff Turner on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5982479. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, # 2 Exhibit B- Solco Prinston Consent, # 3 Exhibit C - HDG Consent, # 4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turner, Matthew)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/22/18 as Document No. 17, Defendant Hen House Marketplace, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages. At filing counsel's request, the document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel will refile the correct document. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?