United States v. Londonio
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:17-cr-00089

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 17, 2020 at 9:34 AM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Steven Crea , Jr., Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Information - Felony
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Sever Defendant
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unseal Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ast) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER by Paul Cassano as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Mathew J. Mari dated 12-14-17 re: We respectfully submit this letter in anticipation of Mr. Cassanos bail hearing scheduled to occur before this Court on December 18, 2017. The purpose of this submission is to summarily apprise this Court of facts supporting Mr. Cassanos request for bail. Document filed by Paul Cassano. (Mari, Mathew) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ast) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Anthony DiPietro, Esq., dated 12/01/2017 re: seeking an order compelling the Government to provide (1) information substantiating the occurrence and timing of the firearm, attempted murder, and gambling charges against defendant Paul Cassano; (2) grand jury minutes pertaining to the firearm and attempted murder charge; and (3) the date on which prosecutors learned of the allegations charged in this proceedings . Document filed by Paul Cassano as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato. (Dipietro, Anthony) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 164 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ast) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ast) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ast) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              (3) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Christopher Londonio (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss-3ss, 7ss, 8ss, 9ss, 10ss, Terrance Caldwell (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss-4ss, 8ss, 9ss, Matthew Madonna (3) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 8s, 9s, Steven Crea, Sr (4) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 5s-6s, 8s, 9s, Joseph Dinapoli (5) count(s) 1s, 9s, Steven Crea, Jr (6) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 5s, 8s, 9s, Dominic Truscello (7) count(s) 1s, 9s, John Castelucci (8) count(s) 1s, 9s, Tindaro Corso (9) count(s) 1s, 9s, Joseph Venice (10) count(s) 1s, 9s, James Maffucci (11) count(s) 1s, 7s, 9s, Joseph Datello (12) count(s) 1s, 6s, 7s, 9s, Paul Cassano (13) count(s) 1s, 5s, 9s, Vincent Bruno (14) count(s) 1s, 5s, 9s, Brian Vaughan (15) count(s) 1s, 7s, 9s, Carmine Garcia (16) count(s) 1s, 7s, 9s, Richard O'Connor (17) count(s) 1s, 7s, 9s, Robert Camilli (18) count(s) 1s, John Incatasciato (19) count(s) 1s. (lnl) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Caliendo appearing for Steven Crea, Jr. Appearance Type: Retained. (Caliendo, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from AUSA Jacqueline Kelly dated September 29, 2017 re: July 28, 2017 Bail Hearing Document filed by USA. (Kelly, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Scott Hartman, dated 9/13/2017, re: The Government writes to request that the Superseding Indictment in the above-referenced case be unsealed. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 9/13/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato. Time excluded from 9/14/2017 until 11/3/2017. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/14/2017)(lnl) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato on re: 132 LETTER by USA addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from AUSA Scott Hartman dated September 13, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment and Pretrial Schedule Document filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Conference adjourned to 11/3/17 at 3:30 pm. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/14/2017)(lnl) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from AUSA Scott Hartman dated September 13, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment and Pretrial Schedule Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Superseding (S3) Indictment)(Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ast) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL as to Steven Crea, Jr.: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED by the undersigned that MARC A. FERNICH, Law Office of Marc Fernich, 810 Seventh Ave., Suite 620, New York, NY 10019 is substituted as attorney for defendant STEVEN CREA, JR. (a.k.a. Steven D. Crea) in place and instead of ROBERT STEVEN FRANKLIN, Law office of Robert S. Franklin, P.A., 120 South Dixie Highway, Suite 207, West Palm Beach, FL 33401, and VALENTIN JR. RODRIGUEZ, Valentin Rodriguez Pa, 120 S. Dixie Highway Suite 203, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Robert Steven Franklin terminated in case as to Steven Crea, Jr.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/8/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc Allan Fernich appearing for Steven Crea, Jr, . Appearance Type: Retained. (Fernich, Marc) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE as to Steven Crea, Jr.: A detention hearing is scheduled for July 28, 2017 at 2:15 p.m. before the Hon. Cathy Seibel at the Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601, Courtroom 621. (Detention Hearing set for 7/28/2017 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel) (lnl) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Steven Crea Jr. (6) on 113 MOTION Review de novo Detention Hearing. ENDORSEMENT: Detention hearing to be held on 7/28/17 at 10 am. The Government is to advise Pre-Trial Services to provide the Court with its report. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/25/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Steven Crea Jr. (6) denying 112 Motion for Bill of Particulars. ENDORSEMENT: Motion denied as premature, both because I have not yet set a motion schedule and because what particulars, if any, are appropriate may turn in part on what information Defendants have in discovery, and I doubt anyone could have humanly reviewed all the discovery by now. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/25/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Transcript of Detention Hearing on 6/15/2017 as to Steven Crea, Jr re: 113 MOTION Review de novo Detention Hearing .. (Rodriguez, Valentin) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Valentin Rodriguez Esq. in Support as to Steven Crea, Jr re: 113 MOTION Review de novo Detention Hearing ., 112 MOTION for Bill of Particulars .. (Rodriguez, Valentin) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Review de novo Detention Hearing . Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Rodriguez, Valentin) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Bill of Particulars . Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Rodriguez, Valentin) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato: Upon the application of the United States of America, Joon H. Kim, Acting United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, by and through Assistant United States Attorneys Scott Hartman, Jacqueline Kelly, and Hagan Scotten, of counsel, for an order precluding the dissemination of material produced in this case pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure (the "Discovery"), and with the consent of all defendants, by and through their counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Discovery shall be used by the defendants ("Defendants"), defense counsel of record ("Defense Counsel"), and anyone else who lawfully possesses Discovery pursuant to this Order, solely for purposes of defending this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants and Defense Counsel are precluded from disseminating any of the Discovery, including any copies thereof or excerpts therefrom, or any information contained therein, to anyone other than: (a) Defendants; (b) Defense Counsel; (c) any paralegal, investigator, or legal assistant employed or contracted by defense counsel ("Defense Staff"); (d) any expert, advisor, or any other individual retained or employed by defendants and defense counsel for the purpose of assisting in the defense in this case ("Defense Experts/Advisors"); or (e) such other persons as hereafter may be authorized by Order of the Court ("Other Authorized Persons"). To the extent the Discovery is disclosed to Defense Staff, Defense Experts/Advisors, or Other Authorized Persons, Defense Counsel shall instruct such individual(s) of the terms of this Order and that such individual(s) are bound by this Order. Defense Counsel may show, but not disseminate to or provide any copies of, the Discovery to potential witnesses ("Potential Witnesses") during the course of and for the purpose of investigation, after Defense Counsel instructs such individual(s) of the terms of this Order and that such individual(s) are bound by this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, Defense Counsel, Defense Staff, Defense Experts/Advisors, Potential Witnesses, and Other Authorized Persons are precluded from posting or causing to be posted any of the Discovery or information contained in the Discovery on the Internet, including any social media website. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, Defense Counsel, Defense Staff, Defense Experts/Advisors, Potential Witnesses, and Other Authorized Persons are precluded, unless authorized by the Government in writing or by Order of the Court, from filing publicly as an attachment to a filing or excerpted within a filing, any of the Discovery or information contained in the Discovery. Any filings that incorporate the Discovery by attachment, contain any excerpts of Discovery, or incorporate Discovery by reference must be filed under seal. Nothing in this Order precludes Defense Counsel from properly using the Discovery in judicial proceedings in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, Defense Counsel, Defense Staff, Defense Experts/Advisors, Potential Witnesses, and Other Authorized Persons are precluded from publicly disclosing or disseminating the identity of any Government cooperating witnesses and/or undercover agents referenced in the Discovery. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/18/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from AUSAs Scott Hartman, Hagan Scotten and Jacqueline Kelly dated July 18, 2017 re: Discovery Update and Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wc) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wc) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE granting 86 Motion for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Crea Jr. (6). ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk shall terminate Doc. 86. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/27/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit Florida Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice)(Franklin, Robert) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FL Supreme Court Certificate Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Pro Hac Admission)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/27/2017 (bcu). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wc) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - THIRD MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/13/2017 (jc). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Second Amended. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/13/2017 (jc). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/13/2017 (jc). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/13/2017 (bcu). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/13/2017 (ma). (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Valentin Rodriguez, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13773447. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven Crea, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Franklin, Robert) Modified on 6/13/2017 (wb). (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato. New Address: Law Offices of Robert S. Franklin, P.A., 120 South Dixie Highway, Suite 207, West Palm Beach, Florida, USA 33401, (561) 775-7000. (Franklin, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Giusti appearing for Tindaro Corso. Appearance Type: Retained. (Giusti, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Steven Franklin appearing for Steven Crea, Jr. Appearance Type: Retained. (Franklin, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (lnl) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jacqueline Christine Kelly appearing for USA. (Kelly, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (lnl) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        (1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Christopher Londonio (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 7s, 8s, 9s, Terrance Caldwell (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-4s, 8s, 9s, Matthew Madonna (3) count(s) 1, 2-3, 8, 9, Steven Crea, Sr (4) count(s) 1, 2-3, 5-6, 8, 9, Joseph Dinapoli (5) count(s) 1, 9, Steven Crea, Jr (6) count(s) 1, 2-3, 5, 8, 9, Dominic Truscello (7) count(s) 1, 9, John Castelucci (8) count(s) 1, 9, Tindaro Corso (9) count(s) 1, 9, Joseph Venice (10) count(s) 1, 9, James Maffucci (11) count(s) 1, 7, 9, Joseph Datello (12) count(s) 1, 6, 7, 9, Paul Cassano (13) count(s) 1, 5, 9, Vincent Bruno (14) count(s) 1, 5, 9, Brian Vaughan (15) count(s) 1, 7, 9, Carmine Garcia (16) count(s) 1, 7, 9, Richard O'Connor (17) count(s) 1, 7, 9, Robert Camilli (18) count(s) 1, John Incatasciato (19) count(s) 1. (lnl) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order to Unseal Indictment as to Christopher Londonio, Terrance Caldwell, Matthew Madonna, Steven Crea, Sr, Joseph Dinapoli, Steven Crea, Jr, Dominic Truscello, John Castelucci, Tindaro Corso, Joseph Venice, James Maffucci, Joseph Datello, Paul Cassano, Vincent Bruno, Brian Vaughan, Carmine Garcia, Richard O'Connor, Robert Camilli, John Incatasciato. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/31/2017)(lnl) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?