Meyer v. American Nursing Services, Incorporated and Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00045
District Judge Ralph R. Beistline, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 15, 2019 at 1:57 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sarah Askoak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Valcarce Law Office, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jim J. Valcarce +1 907 543 2744 +1 907 543 2746 jim@bushlawyers.com
No Logo Sophie Meyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Valcarce Law Office, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jim J. Valcarce +1 907 543 2744 +1 907 543 2746 jim@bushlawyers.com
v.
No Logo American Nursing Services, Incorporated and Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Karl Gross +1 907 276 1550 +1 907 276 3680 dgross@bhb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richmond & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Robert L. Richmond +1 907 276 5727 +1 907 276 2953 brichmond@richmondquinn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gary M. Guarino +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 christine.dollerhide@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Bradley P. Humphreys +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.p.humphreys@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Rose Michele Weckenmann +1 916 208 4956 +1 916 520 3586 rmw@weckenmannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kazhe Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Christina V. Kirk-Kazhe +1 916 226 2590 +1 916 880 5691 ckazhe@kazhelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAVAL SUBMARINE BASE, BANGOR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie Cohen +1 301 796 0551 +1 301 847 8618 leslie.cohen@fda.hhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara V. Iversen +1 701 297 7400 Tara.Iversen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Michael Lantka +1 602 514 7739 +1 602 514 7760 peter.lantka@usdoj.gov
, , , James Patrick Thomas +1 701 530 2420 +1 701 530 2421 James.P.Thomas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Rottenberg Lipman Rich, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard Edward Rosberger +1 212 822 5729 rrosberger@rlrpclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lorraine D. Gallinger +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 charla.hayward@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Ann M Bildtsen +1 612 664 5615 +1 612 664 5788 ann.bildtsen@usdoj.gov
, , , Daniel R. Cooper, Jr. +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 daniel.cooper@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2017, TERMINATED: 08/17/2017, TERMINATED: 08/17/2017, TERMINATED: 08/17/2017, TERMINATED: 08/17/2017, TERMINATED: 08/17/2017 Adam Anderson Grogg +1 202 514 2395 adam.a.grogg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Gary M. Guarino +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 christine.dollerhide@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Sandra Ema Gutierrez +1 504 680 3000 +1 504 589 3602 Sandra.Gutierrez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Daniel David Hu +1 713 567 9518 +1 713 718 3303 daniel.hu@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew J. Lievense +1 313 226 9665 +1 313 226 3271 andrew.lievense@usdoj.gov
, , , Susan J. Lindquist +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 susan.lindquist@usdoj.gov
Space Donald R. Lorenzen +1 312 353 5300 donald.lorenzen@usdoj.gov
, , , Kathleen Anne Mahoney +1 718 254 6026 +1 718 254 6081 Kathleen.Mahoney@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Charles Michael O'Connor +1 415 436 7180 +1 415 436 6748 Charles.OConnor@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, TERMINATED: 05/22/2014, TERMINATED: 05/22/2014 Michael C Pollack +1 202 305 8550 +1 202 616 8470 michael.c.pollack@usdoj.gov
, , , Richard L. Pomeroy +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 richard.pomeroy@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018 Julie Shana Saltman +1 202 532 4252 +1 202 616 8470 julie.saltman@usdoj.gov
, , , Camela C. Theeler +1 605 357 2342 +1 605 330 4402 camela.theeler@usdoj.gov
, Marti M Watkins Cherry-DOJ +1 817 252 5237 +1 817 252 5458 mary.cherry@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD Christina Bahr Moore +1 314 539 3991 +1 314 539 2777 christina.moore@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Sara E. Costello +1 202 305 0466 +1 202 305 0267 Sara.Costello@usdoj.gov
, , , , Daniel Kadane Crane-Hirsch +1 202 616 8242 +1 202 514 8742 daniel.crane-hirsch@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/21/2017, ATTORNEY T Adam Anderson Grogg +1 202 514 2395 adam.a.grogg@usdoj.gov
, , Charles A Guadagnino +1 414 297 1745 +1 414 297 1738 charles.guadagnino@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Christopher Randall Hall +1 202 514 4778 +1 202 616 8202 christopher.hall@usdoj.gov
, , , , , James W. Harlow +1 202 514 6786 +1 202 514 8742 james.w.harlow@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bailey Wilson Heaps +1 202 514 1280 +1 202 616 8470 bailey.w.heaps@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bradley P. Humphreys +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.p.humphreys@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Bradley P. Humphreys +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 bradley.p.humphreys@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018, TERMINATED: 01/26/2018 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Matthew J.B. Lawrence +1 202 305 0747 +1 202 616 8202 Matthew.J.Lawrence@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily B Nestler +1 202 616 8489 emily.b.nestler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Emily Sue Newton +1 202 305 8356 emily.s.newton@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael C Pollack +1 202 305 8550 +1 202 616 8470 michael.c.pollack@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jacek Pruski +1 202 616 2035 +1 202 616 8470 jacek.pruski@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Stuart Justin Robinson +1 202 514 9239 stuart.j.robinson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/23/2017, TERMINATED: 10/23/2017, TERMINATED: 10/23/2017, TERMINATED: 10/23/2017, TERMINATED: 10/23/2017, TERMINATED: 10/23/2017 Julie Shana Saltman +1 202 532 4252 +1 202 616 8470 julie.saltman@usdoj.gov
, Juan Villasenor +1 303 454 0185 +1 303 454 0404
No Logo United States of America Dept of Health & Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gary M. Guarino +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 christine.dollerhide@usdoj.gov
, Mary B. Pinkel +1 907 271 3388 +9073 907 907 3224 mary.pinkel@usdoj.gov
, E BRYAN WILSON +1 850 216 3825 +1 850 942 8467 bryan.wilson@usdoj.gov
No Logo Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephen H. Hutchings +1 907 276 1550 +1 907 276 3680 shutchings@bhb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard L. Pomeroy +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 richard.pomeroy@usdoj.gov
No Logo American Nursing Services, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richmond & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Robert L. Richmond +1 907 276 5727 +1 907 276 2953 brichmond@richmondquinn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gary M. Guarino +1 907 271 5071 +1 907 271 2344 christine.dollerhide@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER Granting Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice at Docket 23 . (RRB/Jan) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by United States of America Dept of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Guarino, Gary) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to Complaint Third-Party Cross Claim of ANS by Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation.(Hutchings, Stephen) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Guarino, Gary) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by American Nursing Services, Inc. re 18 Scheduling Conference, (Richmond, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline: Scheduling Conference held on 9/2/2010. Court ordered parties to file a scheduling order by 9/15/2010. Court ordered Mr. Richmond to produce information re insurace policy to the plaintiff within 10 days. (Court Recorder SCD.)Plaintiff Counsel-David Henderson (Telephonic); Defense Counsel-Gary Guarino, Robert Richmond, Steve Hutchings (Telephonic); (SCD, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Hutchings on behalf of Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation (Hutchings, Stephen) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Scheduling Conference in this matter is rescheduled and will be held on Thursday, September 2, 2010, at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Parties/counsel needing to attend telephonically may do so by calling 907-677-6246 at the time scheduled for the hearing. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TEXT ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Hearing at Docket 14 is GRANTED. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Continue Hearing Date (Unopposed) by American Nursing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Marc G. Wilhelm, # 2 Proposed Order)(Richmond, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING: Pursuant to the Notice to Court at Docket 12, a Scheduling Conference will be held in this matter on Thursday, August 12, 2010, at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Parties/counsel needing to attend telephonically may do so by calling 907-677-6246 at the time scheduled for the hearing. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Hearing: Re Lifting of Stay and Remand, Request for Scheduling Conference by Sarah Askoak, Sophie Meyer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Valcarce, Jim) Modified on 7/14/2010 to correct docket text to reflect motion. (SLM, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. (Jan, Chambers Staff) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STIPULATION for Consolidation of Related Cases and Proposed Order by American Nursing Services, Inc., American Nursing Services, Incorporated and Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Guarino, Gary) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ralph R. Beistline: Status Conference held on 11/19/2009. Court ordered parties to file a proposed order indicating the parties agree that case numbers 4:08-CV-00049-RRB and 4:09CV-00045-RRB are consolidated and new case caption. Court ordered parties to file a stipulated amended Scheduling and Planning Order once bankruptcy is lifted in case 4:09-CV-00049-RRB. (Court Recorder AXG.)Plaintiff Counsel-Not Present; Defense Counsel-Gary M. Guarino; Robert Richmond and Stephen Hutchens; (AXG, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CORRECTED ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING: A Status Conference will be held in this matter on Thursday, November 19, 2009, at 10:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Counsel/parties needing to attend telephonically may do so by calling 907-677-6247 at the time of the hearing. (SLM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING: A Status Conference will be held in this matter on Thursday, November 19, 2009, at 10:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Counsel/parties needing to attend telephonically may do so by calling 907-677-6246 at the time of the hearing. (JPS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re 3 MOTION to Stay FROM PLAINTIFF AND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Guarino, Gary) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Guarino, Gary) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Service List by United States Department of Health and Human Services re 2 Order (Guarino, Gary) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION to Stay by American Nursing Services, Inc., American Nursing Services, Incorporated and Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition, # 2 Proposed Order for Motion to Stay)(Richmond, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Minute ORDER to Petitioners Subsequent to Removal. Petitioners to file with in 20 days copies of state court documents and 10 days for service list.. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/20/09. (JAP, COURTSTAFF) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Health and Human Services from Superior Court for the State of Alaska Fourth Judicial District at Bethel, case number 4BE-09-242-CI. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Removal State Court, # 2 Exhibit A Answer, # 3 Exhibit B Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAP, COURTSTAFF) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?