Gayan-Esones v. Healthcare Collection Incorporated

Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-01651
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge David G Campbell
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 11:29 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Kristine Gayan-Esones, Plaintiff

Represented by Smith Paknejad Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Pouria Paknejad +1 602 888 9900 +1 888 552 8529 paknejad@phxlawfirm.com
, Gary Michael Smith +1 480 428 0529
No Logo Unknown Party, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Suzanne Marie Easter +1 602 418 0376 +1 602 418 0376 suzanneeaster@cox.net
, Amy G Langerman +1 619 437 4579 +1 619 437 4580 alangermanlaw@aol.com

Represented by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, CA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Zulaikha Aziz +1 213 241 0245 +1 213 977 7595
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, (Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014 Carmina OCampo +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 cocampo@apalc.org
TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Yungsuhn Park +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 ypark@apalc.org

Represented by Aspey, Watkins & Diesel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Donald Hamilton Bayles, Jr. +1 928 774 1478 +1 928 774 8404 dbayles@awdlaw.com

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Sarah Lynn Barnes +1 602 271 7700 +1 602 258 7785 slb@bowwlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jorge Martin Castillo +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 jcastillo@maldef.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Justin B. Cox +1 404 523 2721 +1 404 653 0331 jcox@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Marita Cecilia Etcubanez +1 202 255 3365 +1 202 296 2318 metcubanez@advancingjustice-aajc.org
TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kelly Joyce Flood +1 602 251 3620 +1 602 251 8055 kelly.flood@asualumnilawgroup.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/06/2018 Andres J Gallegos +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 agallegos@maldef.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY Lucas Guttentag +1 415 343 0773 +1 415 395 0950 lguttentag@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andres R Holguin-Flores +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 AHolguin-Flores@MALDEF.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Omar C. Jadwat +1 212 549 2620 +1 212 549 2654 ojadwat@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James Duff Lyall +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 jlyall@acluaz.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Margaret G Maraschino +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3708 margaret.maraschino@mto.com
TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED Lika Cynthia Miyake +1 213 683 9165 +1 213 683 4065 lika.miyake@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Daniel R Ortega, Jr. +1 602 386 4455 +1 602 386 4480 danny@ortegalaw.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 dpochoda@acluaz.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jessica Polansky +1 212 549 2621 +1 212 549 2654 irp_jp@aclu.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Victor Viramontes +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 vviramontes@maldef.org
, , , , , , , Philip R Wooten +1 480 598 4330 +1 480 598 4331 philip.wooten@azbar.org

Represented by Chandler City Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael E McNeff +1 480 782 4640 +1 480 782 4652 michael.mcneff@chandleraz.gov

Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Brian Barnes +1 202 220 9600 bbarnes@cooperkirk.com
, , , , , , , Michael William Kirk +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 mkirk@cooperkirk.com
, , , , , , , Harold Smith Reeves +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 393 5719 hreeves@cooperkirk.com

Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Nathan Daniel Cardozo +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 nate@eff.org
, Kurt Bradford Opsahl +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 kurt@eff.org
, Mitchell L. Stoltz +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mitch@eff.org

Represented by Freeman, Freeman & Salzman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Christopher M. Kelly +1 312 222 5100

Represented by Goldwater Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Aditya Dynar +1 602 462 5000 adynar@goldwaterinstitute.org
, , , , , Christina Maria Sandefur +1 602 462 5000 +1 602 256 7045 CSandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org

Represented by Immigrants' Rights Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY T Christine P. Sun - PHV +1 212 549 2661 +1 212 549 2650 csun@aclu.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Cecillia Derphine Wang +1 415 343 0775 +1 415 395 0950 cwang@aclu.org

Represented by Joseph C Gioconda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joseph C Gioconda

Represented by Kelly Warner PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Daniel Robert Warner +1 480 331 9397 +1 866 961 4984 dan@kellywarnerlaw.com

Represented by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Nicholas Soltman +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 nsoltman@kwikalaw.com

Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Karl Stephen Kronenberger +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 karl@KRInternetlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey M Rosenfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 jeff@krinternetlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Steven C Vondran PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Steven Charles Vondran +1 877 276 5084 +1 888 551 2252 law@attorneysteve.net

Represented by Leon Medzhibovsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Leon Medzhibovsky

Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Nina Perales +1 210 224 5476 +1 210 224 5382 nperales@maldef.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Thomas Andrew Saenz +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 opaniagua@maldef.org

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED Aaron G Leiderman +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 512 4077 aaron.leiderman@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin James Maro +1 213 683 9246 +1 213 683 4046 Benjamin.Maro@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY T Paul J Watford +1 213 683 9172 +1 213 683 4072 paul.watford@mto.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY Joseph J Ybarra +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 joseph.ybarra@mto.com

Represented by NAACP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, TERMINATED: 12/06/2011, TERMINATED: 12/06/2011 Laura D Blackburne +1 410 580 5673 +1 410 358 9350 lblackburne@naacpnet.org

Represented by National Day Laborer Organizing Network

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jessica Karp Bansal +1 213 380 2214 +1 213 380 2878 jbansal@ndlon.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012 Lisa Kung , +1 213 380 2785 +1 213 380 2787 kung@ndlon.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Newman , +1 213 380 2785 +1 213 380 2787 newman@ndlon.org

Represented by National Immigration Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Nicholas David Espiritu +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 espiritu@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Alvaro M Huerta +1 213 639 3900 huerta@nilc.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Linton Joaquin +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 joaquin@nilc.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Melissa S Keaney +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 keaney@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Nora A Preciado +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 preciado@nilc.org
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Karen Cassandra Tumlin +1 213 674 2850 +1 213 639 3911 tumlin@nilc.org

Represented by Paul F Lazarus PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F Lazarus +1 602 274 7611 +1 602 234 0341 pfl@lazaruspc.com

Represented by Rusing Lopez & Lizardi PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, P Andrew Sterling +1 520 792 4800 +1 520 529 4262 asterling@rllaz.com

Represented by Scott MacMillan Baker PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Scott M Baker +1 520 629 0900 +1 520 326 6494 smbaker1@qwestoffice.net

Represented by sggimmigration.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Connie Choi +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 connie@sggimmigration.com

Represented by Strasburger & Price LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Tiffany L Cox +1 469 287 3921 +1 469 227 6581 tiffany.cox@strasburger.com

Represented by Suite 550

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Iwana M Rademaekers +1 214 579 9319 +1 469 444 6456 iwana@rademaekerslaw.com

Represented by Unknown Party

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Unknown Party

Represented by Virginia A Sanderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Virginia A Sanderson

Represented by White Berberian PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Paul David Ticen +1 480 636 8150 pticen@wbazlaw.com
, Steven Matthew White +1 480 626 2783 +1 480 718 8368 swhite@wbazlaw.com
v.
No Logo Christian Lehr, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
No Logo Deborah Lehr, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
No Logo Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
No Logo Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by Carlson & Messer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com

Represented by JENNINGS HAUG & CUNNINGHAM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Russell R Yurk +1 602 234 7800 +1 602 277 5595 rry@jhc-law.com

Represented by JENNINGS, HAUG & CUNNINGHAM, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, James L Csontos +1 602 234 7832 +1 602 277 5595 jlc@jhc-law.com
, Robert John Lamb +1 602 234 7800 +1 602 277 5595 rjl@jhc-law.com

Represented by Jerold Kaplan Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Patricio Esquivel +1 602 258 8433 +1 602 258 4302 pesquivel@kdelaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
No Logo Maggie and Kate LLC, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
No Logo Marjorie Peach, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
No Logo Paul R Peach, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery John Carlson +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 carlsonj@cmtlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , June Grace Felipe +1 310 242 2200 +1 310 242 2222 felipeg@cmtlaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM FIFE, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , WILLIAM W. FIFE, III +1 480 656 3924 +1 480 619 6238 william@williamfifelaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, the Parties' stipulation of dismissal 24 is granted; this action is dismissed in its entirety; all fees and costs have been paid and all matters in controversy for which this action was brought have been fully settled, compromised and adjourned. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/12/14. (REW) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, Paul R Peach. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Felipe, June) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Settlement Conference held on 10/6/2014. Settlement Agreement reached. The parties shall file a Notice of Settlement and submit appropriate dismissal paperwork with the Court. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:30 AM to 2:00 PM.(REW) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, Paul R Peach. (Felipe, June) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting the 19 Motion to Appear Telephonically as to Defendant Healthcare Collection Inc. Defendant's insurance adjustor is excused from an in-person appearance at the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/17/2014.(LFIG) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kristine Gayan-Esones. (Smith, Gary) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Defendant's Insurance Adjuster at MSC (Unopposed) by Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, Paul R Peach. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Felipe, June) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, Settlement Conference set for 10/6/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns (see order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/10/14. (REW) Modified on 9/12/2014 (REW). (Entered: 09/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/24/2015. Dispositive motions due by 5/22/2015.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/6/2014. (see order for additional deadlines)(TCA) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 9/4/2014. Service on the Bond Company addressed. Defendant by close of business 9/5/2014 give the information to plaintiff for service. Deadlines discussed. Parties agree to a Magistrate Judge designation for settlement conference. Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns randomly drawn. Parties to contact her chambers for a date and time. Court will enter a scheduling order. APPEARANCES: Gary Smith and Pouria Paknejad for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by June Felipe for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:26 PM to 4:38 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffery J Carlson on behalf of defendants Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, and Paul R Peach. (BAS) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney June Grace Felipe on behalf of defendants Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, and Paul R Peach. (BAS) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, Paul R Peach. (Fife, William) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/30/2014. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
*ANSWER to Complaint by Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Marjorie Peach, Paul R Peach.(Fife, William) *Modified to remove Jury Demand from text on 7/30/2014* (REW). (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
*Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maggie and Kate LLC identifying Other Affiliate Healthcare Collections-I LLC for Maggie and Kate LLC. (Fife, William) *Modified to correct docket text on 8/14/2015 (RCO). (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
*ANSWER to Complaint by Maggie and Kate LLC.(Fife, William) *Modified to remove Jury Demand from text on 7/30/2014* (REW). (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/2014. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
*Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Deborah Lehr, Maggie and Kate LLC, Marjorie Peach, Paul R Peach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Discovery Requests, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Fife, William) *Modified on 7/24/2014; document does not contain a case number* (REW). (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
*Corporate Disclosure Statement by Healthcare Collections-I LLC identifying Other Affiliate Maggie and Kate, LLC for Healthcare Collections-I LLC. (Fife, William) *Modified on 7/24/2014; document does not contain a case number* (REW). (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by Deborah Lehr, Paul R Peach, Healthcare Collections-I LLC, Christian Lehr, Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Marjorie Peach. Required document is not attached. Please file the following: Automated Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Healthcare Collections-I LLC. (REK) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10690126. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01651-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2014-053759. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10690126 filed by Christian Lehr, Healthcare Collection Incorporated, Paul R Peach, Marjorie Peach, Deborah Lehr, Healthcare Collections-I LLC. (submitted by William Fife) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(REK) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 24 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?