John Rockey v. Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-01032

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 11:41 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Rockey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farrimond Castillo & Bresnahan, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Steven James Medina +1 210 231 0919 +1 210 231 0004 smedina@fcbtxlaw.com
No Logo Mubeena Rockey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farrimond Castillo & Bresnahan, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Steven James Medina +1 210 231 0919 +1 210 231 0004 smedina@fcbtxlaw.com
v.
No Logo Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCathern Mooty Hyde Grinke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jennifer Laurel Murphy +1 214 741 2662 +1 214 741 4717 jmurphy@mccathernlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schell Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Gossom Martin +1 214 665 2000 +1 214 754 0060 jmartin@schellcooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
Space Danette Alvarado Broome +1 214 698 8000 danette.broome@wilsonelser.com
, , , Jennifer Gossom Martin +1 214 698 8000 +1 214 698 1101 jennifer.martin@wilsonelser.com
, , , Michael D. Rose +1 214 698 8000 +1 214 698 1101 michael.rose@wilsonelser.com
, William Nicholas Terrell +1 214 698 8000 +1 214 698 1101 nick.terrell@wilsonelser.com
, Samantha P Torres +1 713 353 2050 samantha.torres@wilsonelser.com
Space Lisa M. Wilson +1 214 698 8000 lisa.wilson@wilsonelser.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of ADR/Mediation Outcome
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR 1-24-2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1-23-2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez; Jury Trial set for 2-4-2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez; ADR Report Deadline due by 1-19-2018; Discovery due by 6-29-2018; Dispositive Motions due by 8-10-2018. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by John Rockey. (Medina, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Scheduling Recommendations Agreed Scheduling Recommendations by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Report by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court. (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due 11-23-17); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER to Complaint -Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas.(Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Filing 1 Certificate of Notice of Removal by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SUPPLEMENT to 1 Notice of Removal, by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas. (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas. (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Certificate of Interested Parties by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas. (Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-10072769), filed by Chubb Lloyd's Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 1, # 3 2, # 4 3, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?