Regus Business Centre Corp. - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-05001
District Judge Adlai S. Hardin, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 11:49 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Regus Business Centre Corp., Plaintiff

Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Z. Mollin +1 212 858 1668 +1 212 858 1500
Space John F. Pritchard +1 212 858 1620 +1 212 858 1713 jpritchard@pillsburywinthrop.com
v.
No Logo ABT Executive Suites, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Michael N. Gottfried

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael N. Gottfried +1 914 630 0044 +1 914 630 0043

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M. Abramowitz +1 212 237 0137 +1 212 237 0100 sabramowitz@velaw.com
No Logo Wynne Jackson Interests, Inc., Defendant
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 12/4/2003 Dismissing this Case with Prejudice. (Rodriguez, Awilda) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Response to Motion for Turnover Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Steven M. Abramowitz on behalf of MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P.. (Abramowitz, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Scheduling Order signed on 4/22/2003 Re: All Discovery Proceedings Shall Be Completed By 7/21/2003. Joint Pretrial Order Due On Or Before 8/4/2003. Final Pretrial Conference Scheduled For 8/13/2003 at 09:40 AM at Courtroom 520 (ASH), White Plains Office. (related document(s)1) (Mercado, Jessica) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1) (related document(s)2, 1) filed by Michael N. Gottfried on behalf of MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Barbra R. Parlin on behalf of Orix Financial Services, Inc.. (Parlin, Barbra) (Entered: 03/25/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Second Notice Rescheduling Hearing Dates and Response Dates on Stay Motion Filed by MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P.; Wynne Jackson Interests, Inc.; and ABT Executive Suites, Inc. and Adversary Proceeding and Motion Filed by Debtor Against the Aforemention Parties (related document(s)8, 4, 1, 7) filed by Michael N. Gottfried on behalf of MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P.. with hearing to be held on 4/8/2003 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 520 (ASH), White Plains Office Objections due by 4/4/2003, (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Stipulation Notice Rescheduling Hearing Dates and Response Dates on Stay Motion Filed by MIL Phase I Dallas L.P,: Wynne Jackson Interests, Inc.; and ABT Executive Suites, Inc. and Adversary Proceeding and Motion Filed by Debtor Against the Aforementioned Parties (related document(s)7) filed by Michael N. Gottfried on behalf of MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P.. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                So Ordered Stipulation signed on 2/20/2003 Between Debtors, MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P., Wynne Jackson Interests, Inc., and ABT Executive Suites, Inc. Re: Rescheduling Hearing Dates And Response Dates On Stay Motion And Adversary Proceeding And Motion Filed By Debtor Against The Aforementioned Parties. Hearings Are Rescheduled For 3/18/2003 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 520 (ASH), White Plains Office. (Mercado, Jessica) (Entered: 02/25/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Affidavit of Service Of Motion For Turnover Order And Preliminary Injunction, Declaration Of Paula Denn In Support of Motion For Turnover Order And Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (related document(s)4) filed by Daniel Z. Mollin on behalf of Regus Business Centre Corp.. (Mollin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Memorandum of Law Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Turnover Order And Preliminary Injunction (related to motions(s)4) (related document(s)4) filed by Daniel Z. Mollin on behalf of Regus Business Centre Corp.. Objections due by 2/18/2003, (Mollin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion for Preliminary Injunction Alternatively For Turnover Order filed by Daniel Z. Mollin on behalf of Regus Business Centre Corp.. with hearing to be held on 2/21/2003 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 520 (ASH), White Plains Office Responses due by 2/18/2003, (Attachments: 1 Declaration of Paula Denn In Support Of Motion For Turnover Order And Preliminary Injunction) (Mollin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Affidavit of Service of Brendan Hickey of service of the Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet, the Summons, and the Verified Complaint in this matter filed by Daniel Z. Mollin on behalf of Regus Business Centre Corp.. (Mollin, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against ABT Executive Suites, Inc. Answer Due: 02/24/2003; MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P. Answer Due: 02/24/2003; Wynne Jackson Interests, Inc. Answer Due: 02/24/2003. (related document(s)1) Filed by Clerk's Office of the United States Bankruptcy Court. with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/20/2003 at 09:40 AM at Courtroom 520 (ASH), White Plains Office, (Mercado, Jessica) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Complaint against MIL Phase I Dallas, L.P., Wynne Jackson Interests, Inc., ABT Executive Suites, Inc. Filed by John F. Pritchard on behalf of Regus Business Centre Corp.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Exhibit E6 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) (Mercado, Jessica) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?