Simkus v. Schaefer, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00003-ESN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John George Simkus, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Eugene M. Nuth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mdsp.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M Kastendieck +1 410 653 4223 +1 410 653 4270

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
No Logo Lucile Bagley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mdsp.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M Kastendieck +1 410 653 4223 +1 410 653 4270

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
No Logo Richard A. Lanham, Sr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mdsp.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M Kastendieck +1 410 653 4223 +1 410 653 4270

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
No Logo William Donald Schaefer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mdsp.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M Kastendieck +1 410 653 4223 +1 410 653 4270

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 4/28/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "granting" [8-1] motion of defendants Schaefer, Lanham, Nuth and Bagley to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, "granting" [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment, being treated as a motion for summary judgment; "denying" [10-1] Plaintiff's Addendum to Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, being treated as a motion to amend the complaint; "entering" summary judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiff; and "directing" that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 4/28/95 ) (c/m 5/1/95 cmh) (microfilmed 5/1/95) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 4/28/95 ). (c/m 5/1/95 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 Response
        RESPONSE by Plaintiff John George Simkus Jr. to [8-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss, [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Response in Support of Motion
          ADDENDUM by John George Simkus Jr. in support of its [2-1] motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, and Statement of Facts/Retaliatory Transfer. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Rule
            Rule 12/56 letter mailed to parties. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995, Terminated: 4/28/1995 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendants William Donald Schaefer, Richard A. Lanham Sr., Eugene M. Nuth and Lucile Bagley to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibit 1. (c/s) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                Return of service unexecuted as to William Donald Schaefer, Richard A. Lanham Sr. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Eugene M. Nuth, Lucile Bagley 1/24/95 Answer due on 2/13/95 for Lucile Bagley, for Eugene M. Nuth (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER "Directing" counsel Show Cause, on or before January 3, 1995 why this Court should not order emergency injunctive relief in response to Plaintiff's claim; and "Directing" Clerk to mail copies, as therein set forth. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 01/12/95 ) (c/m: 01/19/95 pt) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER "Directing" Plaintiff to inform the Court of any change of address; "Directing" Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and "Directing" Defendants to answer the complaint within 60 days, as therein set forth. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 01/12/95 )(c/m: 01/19/95 pt) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        MOTION by John George Simkus Jr. to Dispense with the Requirement of Security (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION by John George Simkus Jr. to Dispense with the Requirement of Exhaustion of State Administrative Remedies (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Motion for TRO
                            MOTION by John George Simkus Jr. for Temporary Restraining Order (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT filed; (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?