Grant-Bey v. Smith, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00004-ESN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bernard Harry Grant-Bey, Petitioner
v.
No Logo J. Joseph Curran, Jr., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo William L. Smith, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 3/27/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 96-6778:[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Appeal Record Returned
Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [13-1] appeal by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [13-1] appeal by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey "DENYING" a Certificate of Appealability and "DISMISSING" the Appeal, copy of Opinion attached hereto. (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number Re: [13-1] appeal by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey USCA NUMBER: 96-6778:. (Yevone Jeffreys is the case manager): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II )(dated 5/15/96) "Denying" a certificate of probable cause to appeal as therein set forth. (c/m). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [13-1] appeal by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey. (1 volume): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [13-1] appeal by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey. (c/m). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey . Fee Status: In forma pauperis: Appeal record due on 6/13/96. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/14/1996
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER dismissing [1-1] petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Bernard H. Grant-Bey; and "DIRECTING" this case be closed. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 3/27/96 ) (c/m 3/27/96-dtm) (MICROFILMED 4/1/96) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 3/27/96 ) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 Terminated Case
                    Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Correspondence
                      CORRESPONDENCE from plaintiff to Northrop, J. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 Response to Habeas Petition
                        ANSWER by William L. Smith, J. Joseph Curran Jr. to [2-1] order, [1-1] petition. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting respondents' [7-1] motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings up to and including 5/15/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995, Terminated: 5/4/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION by William L. Smith, J. Joseph Curran Jr. to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 4/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting respondents' [5-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to order to show cause nunc pro tunc up to and including 4/28/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 3/29/95 c/m 3/29/95-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995, Terminated: 3/29/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MOTION by William L. Smith, J. Joseph Curran Jr. to Extend Time to file a response to order to show cause (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting respondents' [3-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the show cause order on or before 3/28/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 3/2/95 c/m 3/2/95-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995, Terminated: 3/2/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by William L. Smith, J. Joseph Curran Jr. to Extend Time to respond to the show cause order (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                      ORDER "DIRECTING" the respondents TO SHOW CAUSE on or before 2/28/95 as to why this writ should not be issued, and "Granting" leave to proceed in forma pauperis; ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 1/10/95 c/m 1/11/95-pt) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/14/1996
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                        MOTION by Bernard Harry Grant-Bey to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                          PETITION for writ of habeas corpus with voluminious attachments. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?