Walters v. Carey
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00005-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christian Walters, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Sharon Carey, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Baltimore City
Terminated 1/30/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [3-1] motion of Plaintiff to Dismiss; and "DISMISSING" this case as requested by Plaintiff. ( signed by Chief Judge J. F. Motz ) (c/m 1/27/95 mec) (microfilmed 2/1/95) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995, Terminated: 1/30/1995 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION by Christian Walters to Dismiss . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER "Granting" [1-1] motion of Plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; "Directing" Plaintiff to inform this Court of any change of address; "Directing" Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and "Directing" Defendants to answer the complaint within 60 days, as therein set forth. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 01/17/95 )(c/m: 01/17/95 mjl) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995, Terminated: 1/17/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
          MOTION by Christian Walters to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995, Terminated: 1/17/1995 Complaint
            COMPLAINT filed; (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 39 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?