Boone v. AAA Mid-Atlantic, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00006-FAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glenda F. Boone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glen Marcus Fallin +1 410 465 3382 +1 410 975 0851
v.
No Logo AAA Mid-Atlantic, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman & Minton, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Miller Goldman +1 410 783 7575 +1 410 783 1711 kgoldman@charmcitylegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lord and Whip PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Paul Mullen +1 410 539 5881 +1 410 685 6726 mullen@lordwhip.com
Space Carmen Grafton Schwartz +1 410 539 5881
No Logo Insurance Agency, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman & Minton, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Miller Goldman +1 410 783 7575 +1 410 783 1711 kgoldman@charmcitylegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lord and Whip PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Paul Mullen +1 410 539 5881 +1 410 685 6726 mullen@lordwhip.com
Space Carmen Grafton Schwartz +1 410 539 5881
No Logo William D. Markland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman & Minton, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Miller Goldman +1 410 783 7575 +1 410 783 1711 kgoldman@charmcitylegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lord and Whip PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Paul Mullen +1 410 539 5881 +1 410 685 6726 mullen@lordwhip.com
Space Carmen Grafton Schwartz +1 410 539 5881
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $750000
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 5/17/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 0:94-cv-00000[343026 C.Ct. Balto C]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM "CONCERNING" two orders dated 7/13/95 mailed to counsel by the Clerk's office 6/15/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 7/12/95 c/m 7/12/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER "APPROVING" Settlement; and "DISMISSING" this case with Prejudice. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 6/13/95 ) (c/m 6/15/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice and "APPROVAL". (signed Judge Frank A. Kaufman 6/13/95) (c/m 6/15/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by Glenda F. Boone, AAA Mid-Atlantic, et al. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER "DISMISSING" Civil Action with each Party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to Reopen this Action if Settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 5/16/95 ) (c/m 5/17/95-dc) (MICROFILMED 5/18/95) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Terminated Case
            Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by AAA Mid-Atlantic, et al and "APPROVAL". (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by Glenda F. Boone and "REQUESTING" Counsel to submit a joint written staus report by 5/1/95. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM "ADVISING" Counsel to submit a written status report on or before 3/29/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 3/15/95 ) (c/m 3/15/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Correspondence
                    CORRESPONDENCE from counsel Goldman re: summons (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Local Rule
                      Local Rule 103.3 Statement of defendants (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Remark
                        PLEADINGS 2-3 ARE COPIES OF PLEADINGS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF BALTIMORE CITY 94-343026. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of filing of the notice of removal by AAA Mid-Atlantic, Insurance Agency, William D. Markland (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT filed; (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Notice of Removal
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 116420 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?