Matthew OA v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00007-ESN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yun Yang Matthew OA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew S. Yoo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew S. Yoo +1 410 685 2555 +1 410 685 2598
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Department Of Agriculture, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov
No Logo Yun Yang Matthew OA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew S. Yoo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew S. Yoo +1 410 685 2555 +1 410 685 2598
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 4208(B) Agency Action Review
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 11/30/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and "APPROVAL" (signed by Senior Judge Edward S. Northrop 3/15/96; c/m 3/19/96 dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996, Terminated: 12/31/1997 Motion for Extension of Time to File
    LETTER/JOINT MOTION by parties to Extend Time to execute settlement agreement to an additional thirty (30) days (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER "GRANTING" [19-1] motion to Extend Time for motioning the court to reopen case; "AMENDING" court's amended order of 1/2/96 such that its entry is without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action until and including 2/29/96 and "DIRECTING" that no further requests for extension of time shall be granted. ( signed by Sr. Judge Herbert N. Maletz 2/1/96; c/m dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting defendants' [19-1] motion to Extend Time for motioning the court to reopen if need be up to and including 1/29/96. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 1/2/96 c/m 1/2/96-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/3/1996, Terminated: 1/2/1996 Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Letter MOTION by USA, and Deptartment Agriculture to Extend Time for motioning the court to reopen if need be (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/02/1996
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER "DISMISSING" the case as SETTLED without prejudice as to all claims: cross, third-party and counter, if any; "DIRECTING" each party to bear own costs, unless otherwise agreed; "ALLOWING" either party to move for reopening within 30 days for good cause. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 11/30/95 c/m 11/30/95-dtm micro 12/5/95-lew) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Terminated Case
              Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Trial Brief
                TRIAL BRIEF by USA, USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Pretrial Order
                  PRETRIAL ORDER of plaintiff filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Pretrial Conference - Final
                    Pre-trial conference held before, Northrop, SJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Pretrial Order
                      PRETRIAL ORDER of Government filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER/LETTER Scheduling" pretrial conference for Friday, November 17, 1995 at 9:30 a.m. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 11/9/95 )(c/m: chambers) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER "GRANTING" [10-1] motion of defendant to Compel discovery and "DIRECTING" plaintiff to submit his answer to defendant's interrogatories and request for production of doucments by the end of business on 11/13/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 11/8/95; c/m dtm ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by Yun Yang Matthew OA to [10-1] motion of defendant to Compel discovery. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER "DIRECTING" plaintiff to file his response to defendant's motion to compel on or before 11/7/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 11/1/95 c/m 11/3 /95-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995, Terminated: 11/8/1995 Motion to Compel
                                MOTION by USA to Compel discovery (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM reset Pretrial Conference for 9:30 11/9/95 , and reset Bench Trial for 10:00 11/30/95 ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 9/22/95) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/21/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                    Letter MOTION by Yun Yang Matthew OA, USA, Dept. Agriculture to Amend [6-1] Scheduling order (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                      INFORMAL LETTER ORDER, set Pretrial Order deadline to 9/19/95; cancelling the pretrial conference set for 9/19/95 ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 8/25/95) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/19/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial conference for 9:30 9/19/95 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 9/12/95 ; Bench trial set for 10:00 10/16/95 ( signed by Sr. Judge Edward S. Northrop 6/14/95 hd 6/14/95-dtm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995 Scheduling Conference
                                          Scheduling conference held before Northrop, SJ (30 minutes) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995 Counterclaim
                                            COUNTERCLAIM by USA against Yun Yang Matthew OA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Status Conference
                                              Status conference set at 9:30 6/14/95 before Northrop,S.J.; status report due one week in advnace of conference. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/05/1995
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995 Answer
                                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA, Dept. Agriculture (Attorney Lynne A. Battaglia, Allen F. Loucks), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Summons Issued
                                                  SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA and Department of Agriculture. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT and Exhibits A-D filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 116421. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?