Maryland State v. Veterans Affairs, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00008-FAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maryland State Department of Education, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evelyn Omega Cannon +1 410 396 3599 +1 410 545 6237
Space Caroline E Emerson +1 410 367 5113

Toggle Switch Represented by BUC & BEARDSLEY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen Mercedes Shepard +1 202 736 3620 +1 202 736 3608 cshepard@bucbeardsley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Joseph Curran, Jr. +1 410 576 6300 +1 410 576 6880
v.
No Logo Jesse Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Burke +1 949 357 0377 +1 949 606 9066 gburkelaw@yahoo.com
Space Frank Hunger +1 202 616 4289
Space Sheila M. Lieber +1 202 616 8474 +1 202 616 8470
Space Elise S. Shore +1 202 616 8474

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov
No Logo John T. Farrar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Burke +1 949 357 0377 +1 949 606 9066 gburkelaw@yahoo.com
Space Frank Hunger +1 202 616 4289
Space Sheila M. Lieber +1 202 616 8474 +1 202 616 8470
Space Elise S. Shore +1 202 616 8474

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Phaup, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Burke +1 949 357 0377 +1 949 606 9066 gburkelaw@yahoo.com
Space Frank Hunger +1 202 616 4289
Space Sheila M. Lieber +1 202 616 8474 +1 202 616 8470
Space Elise S. Shore +1 202 616 8474

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Burke +1 949 357 0377 +1 949 606 9066 gburkelaw@yahoo.com
Space Frank Hunger +1 202 616 4289
Space Sheila M. Lieber +1 202 616 8474 +1 202 616 8470
Space John Schumann +1 202 514 3256
Space Elise S. Shore +1 202 616 8474

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Allen F Loucks +1 410 209 4812 +1 410 962 2310 allen.loucks@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 8/18/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 95-2626:[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 Order
ORDER (Certified Copy) (USCA) "Affirming" the judgment of the District Court, opinion attached (c/s) (jas, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 Certificate of Clerk
    Certificate of Clerk (Copy), "Certifying" record as complete for appeal purposes for [42-1] appeal. (Copies mailed). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number Re: [42-1] appeal by Maryland State USCA NUMBER: 95-2626: (Debbie Daniel is the case manager): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 43 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 Remark
        Certificate of No order of transcript of plaintiff and statement of the issues on appeal attached. (cc court of appeals). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
          Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [42-1] appeal by Maryland State. (d/s, t.p.o.f. and copies mailed). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 42 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Maryland State. Fee Status: Paid: (Receipt #111461): Appeal record due on 9/27/95. (c/s 8/28/95 akc). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 41 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER "DENYING" all relief sought by Plaintiff and "ENTERING" Judgment in favor of Defendants. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 8/17/95 ) (c/m 8/18/95-dc) (MICROFILMED 8/21/95) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 40 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 8/17/95 ) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Terminated Case
                  Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Transcript
                    Transcript of Proceedings held before the Court on 5/23/95. (FILED SEPARATELY) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Referring to Plaintiff's June 28, 1995 and to Defendant's June 29, 1995 filings. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 7/7/95 )(c/m 7/7/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 37 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995 Answer to Amended Complaint
                        ANSWER by Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, Kenneth Kizer, and Dennis Smith to amended complaint. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 36 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 7/3/1995 Response
                          MEMORANDUM in RESPONSE by Veterans Affairs, et al to [34-1] June 19, 1995 Order. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/28/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995 Response
                            RESPONSE by Maryland State to [34-1] court's June 19 Memorandum and order. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "DIRECTING" Defedants to file a formal response to the first amended complaint no later than 6/29/95; and "ADVISING" Plaintiff they have the opportunity to seek one or more further types of relief at this time, provided Plaintiff does so within the time and other limitations set forth supra in this memorandum and order. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 6/19/95 ) (c/m 6/19/95-cn) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of attorney appearance for Maryland State by Evelyn O. Cannon. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 Response
                                  RESPONSE by Veterans Affairs to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "ADVISING" counsel if Defendants do not file a response to the first amended complaint by 6/5/95 this court will permit the first amended complaint to be filed; "CANCELLING" the Evidentiary Proceeding; and "REQUESTING" that M. Cannon enter her appearance. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 6/1/95 ) (c/m 6/1/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of filing the Secretary's final Order by Veterans Affairs. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 5/31/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Remark
                                        Supplemental Brief by Plaintiff. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "RECONFIRMING" this court's Memorandum and Order dated 5/22/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 5/26/95 ) (c/m 5/26/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Telephone Conference
                                            Tele-conference held before Kaufman, S.J. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995 Remark
                                              Chambers Conference re: 6/26/96 hearing held before Kaufman, S.J. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "SETTING" date for Trial. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 5/22/95 ) (c/m 5/22/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Response
                                                  REPLY by Maryland State to Defendants' Supplemental memorandum and Request for 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) Interlocutory Order. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995 Telephone Conference
                                                    Tele-conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995 Response in Support of Motion
                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Veterans Affairs in support of their [12-1] motion to Dismiss, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of filing of Affidavit by Michael B. Phaup. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Maryland State, (Answer due 5/15/95 for Michael B. Phaup, for John T. Farrar, for Jesse Brown, for Veterans Affairs ) amending [1-1] complaint. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Response in Support of Motion
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Maryland State in support of [3-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM "CONFIRMING" the schedule set during the off-the-record telephone conference on 5/2/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 5/3/95 ) (c/m 5/4/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/28/1995 Remark
                                                                Chambers Conference held before Kaufman, S.J. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  MARGINAL ORDER mooting [7-1] motion of defendants to Strike [3-1] motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman April 20, 1995) (c/m 4/21/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Motion for Hearing
                                                                    Letter MOTION by Maryland State for Hearing on the plaintiff's and defendant's cross motions for summary judgment . (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/26/1995
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup by Sheila M. Lieber. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 Telephone Conference
                                                                        Tele-conference Held before Kaufman, S.J. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          REPLY by Veterans Affairs, et al to response of Plaintiff to [12-1] motion of Defendants to Dismiss, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE by Maryland State to [12-1] motion of Defendants to Dismiss, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment and Attachments. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER "EXTENDING" the time for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative for Summary Judgment to and including 3/27/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 3/10/95 ) (c/m 3/13/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                SUBSTITUTE MEMORANDUM by Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup in support of their [12-1] motion to Dismiss, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                                                  RESPONSE by Veterans Affairs, et al in opposition to [3-1] motion of Plaintiff for Summary Judgment. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and Exhibits. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER "EXTENDING" the time for Defendants to file a response to the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment to and including 2/24/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/13/95 ) (c/m 2/15/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER mooting [8-1] defendants' opposition response ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) dated Jan.30, 1995 (c/m 2/1/95 dc) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/5/1995, Terminated: 2/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [9-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which defendants may respond to Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment to and including Feb. 10, 1995 ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) dated Jan. 30, 1995 (c/m by chambers 2/1/95 dc) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/5/1995, Terminated: 2/1/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by Maryland State, Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup to Extend Time within which defendants may respond to Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment to and including Feb. 10, 1995 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/28/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                                                              RESPONSE by Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup in opposition to [2-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction and Attachments (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/28/1995 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar to Strike [3-1] motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup 1/6/95 Answer due on 3/6/95 for Michael B. Phaup, for John T. Farrar, for Jesse Brown, for Veterans Affairs (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for Veterans Affairs, Jesse Brown, John T. Farrar, Michael B. Phaup (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Maryland State in support of [3-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [2-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits A thru F (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                        MOTION by Maryland State for Summary Judgment (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                          MOTION by Maryland State for Preliminary Injunction (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injuncitive Relief filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 116422 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?